11344 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVF2402087 | HARRIS, TRACY | 4/8/2025 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs HARRIS, TRACY | |||||||||
CVF2401813 | LAWVER, TONI | 4/8/2025 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs LAWVER, TONI | |||||||||
CVF2402088 | ELLEMAN, YOLANDA | 4/8/2025 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs ELLEMAN, YOLANDA | |||||||||
CVF2400468 | WOOD, CYNTHIA D | 4/8/2025 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK vs WOOD, CYNTHIA D | |||||||||
CVF2402252 | SAETTEL, NICHOLAS | 4/8/2025 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs SAETTEL, NICHOLAS | |||||||||
CVF2401792 | CLARK, WENDY | 4/8/2025 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING, LLC vs CLARK, WENDY | |||||||||
CVI2401517 | M&M CONCRETE, LLC | 4/7/2025 | |||||||
BENTLEY, SCOTT vs M&M CONCRETE, LLC | |||||||||
CVG2500593 | CARTER, ANTONIO | 4/7/2025 | |||||||
AH4R MANAGEMENT-OH, LLC vs CARTER, ANTONIO | |||||||||
CVF2500273 | LUNSFORD, MARY J | 4/7/2025 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs LUNSFORD, MARY J | |||||||||
CVF2400361 | RIDGEWAY, ALYSSA | 4/7/2025 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs RIDGEWAY, ALYSSA | |||||||||
CVG2500594 | COLLIER, JESSICA | 4/7/2025 | |||||||
AH4R MANAGEMENT-OH, LLC vs COLLIER, JESSICA | |||||||||
CVG2500595 | HERNANDEZ, RAMON | 4/7/2025 | |||||||
AH4R MANAGEMENT-OH, LLC vs HERNANDEZ, RAMON | |||||||||
CVF2400705 | MULLINS, DARREN | 4/3/2025 | |||||||
MCCASLIN, IMBUS & MCCASLIN vs MULLINS, DARREN | |||||||||
CVF2500210 | UNGER, PATRICIA | 4/3/2025 | |||||||
CETERIS PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC vs UNGER, PATRICIA | |||||||||
CVF2402344 | ROBINSON, BRYANNA M | 4/3/2025 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, vs ROBINSON, BRYANNA M | |||||||||
CVG2500522 | JACKSON, AMY | 4/2/2025 | |||||||
HASSAN, EZ ELDIN vs JACKSON, AMY | |||||||||
CVG2401271 | CARTER, ANTONIO | 4/2/2025 | |||||||
AUSTIN PARK APARTMENTS II, LLC vs CARTER, ANTONIO | |||||||||
CVG2500505 | SHAUL, MATTHEW | 4/2/2025 | |||||||
VIVO LIVING MIAMISBURG LLC vs SHAUL, MATTHEW | |||||||||
CVG2500498 | SINGH, KULDIP | 4/1/2025 | |||||||
MORGAN PROPERTIES MGMT CO LLC vs SINGH, KULDIP | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 7, 8, 9 ... 566, 567, 568 Next |