Daily Law Journal
11344 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number Defendant Date
14CVF00634 SIERRA N. CENTER 8/25/2014
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs SIERRA N. CENTER
14CVF00641 TIMOTHY L. CABLE 8/25/2014
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs TIMOTHY L. CABLE
14CVF00681 JACOB ZIMMERMAN 8/25/2014
DAYTON RACQUET CLUB C/O RACHEL J. MASON, ESQ. vs JACOB ZIMMERMAN
14CVF00714 GEORGE SHAWVER 8/25/2014
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs GEORGE SHAWVER
14CVF00720 TEVIN CHARLES 8/25/2014
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs TEVIN CHARLES
14CVF00723 JOYCE TURNER 8/25/2014
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs JOYCE TURNER
14CVF00739 MATTHEW S PARTIN 8/25/2014
WRIGHT-PATT CREDIT UNION vs MATTHEW S PARTIN
14CVF00906 LAURA J TATE 8/25/2014
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs LAURA J TATE
14CVF00971 CORY L. POSADNY 8/25/2014
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES, LLC vs CORY L. POSADNY
14CVF00581 TONI CARROLL 8/25/2014
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs TONI CARROLL
14CVF00979 DEBORAH COOK 8/21/2014
MSW CAPITAL LLC vs DEBORAH COOK
14CVI00834 BRYAN HARTMAN 8/20/2014
SETTLERS WALK HOME OWNERS ASSOC, C/O TOWNE PROPERTIES vs BRYAN HARTMAN
14CVI00836 DIEUMY THI NGO 8/20/2014
SETTLERS WALK HOME OWNERS ASSOC, C/O TOWNE PROPERTIES vs DIEUMY THI NGO
14CVI00950 KENDAYIA M. ELBELLALI 8/20/2014
WHITE ALLEN EUROPEAN AUTO GROUP vs KENDAYIA M. ELBELLALI
14CVI01045 GARY BLACKLIDGE 8/20/2014
LINDA L. CREAGER vs GARY BLACKLIDGE
14CVF00336 STEVEN G. DALTON 8/19/2014
HAGERTY & MAZZOLA DDS INC vs STEVEN G. DALTON
14CVF00546 JEFFREY A PARLETT 8/18/2014
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NA vs JEFFREY A PARLETT
14CVF00646 JONTE D. BOSTOCK 8/18/2014
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs JONTE D. BOSTOCK
14CVF00791 WILLIAM M MAGGARD 8/18/2014
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs WILLIAM M MAGGARD

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 566, 567, 568