11310 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
15CVI00206 | TIMOTHY D. ROY | 3/17/2015 | |||||||
TAMARA L. GRAHAM vs TIMOTHY D. ROY | |||||||||
14CVF00648 | AMANDA ANDERSON | 3/16/2015 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs AMANDA ANDERSON | |||||||||
14CVF00981 | DARREN HAYDEN, #A709134 C/O OHIO DEPT. OF REHAB. ... | 3/16/2015 | |||||||
STATE OF OHIO DEPT OF JFS C/O GREG A. GOLDBLATT, SPEC. COU vs DARREN HAYDEN, #A709134... | |||||||||
14CVF01583 | RYAN KEENER | 3/16/2015 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK C/O ZWICKER & ASSOC, PC vs RYAN KEENER | |||||||||
14CVF01915 | BRANDI N SALMONS | 3/16/2015 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs BRANDI N SALMONS | |||||||||
15CVF00005 | KAREN M BARNHART | 3/16/2015 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING D vs KAREN M BARNHART | |||||||||
15CVF00066 | TONYA GUSTIN | 3/16/2015 | |||||||
DCFS TRUST vs TONYA GUSTIN | |||||||||
14CVG00472 | KRISHA WEAVER | 3/12/2015 | |||||||
JESSE H BURCHETT vs KRISHA WEAVER | |||||||||
14CVG00522 | NAOMI SMITH | 3/12/2015 | |||||||
JESSE H BURCHETT vs NAOMI SMITH | |||||||||
14CVG00944 | JENNIFER LEIFHEIT | 3/12/2015 | |||||||
JESSE H BURCHETT vs JENNIFER LEIFHEIT | |||||||||
14CVG01385 | BERLIS V. PREYOR | 3/10/2015 | |||||||
BRINKLEY PROPERTIES, LTD. vs BERLIS V. PREYOR | |||||||||
14CVF01644 | DOROTHY J. RAMSEY | 3/6/2015 | |||||||
BRINKLEY PROPERTIES, LTD vs DOROTHY J. RAMSEY | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 543, 544, 545 ... 564, 565, 566 Next |