11310 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
15CVF00218 | NICHOLE M. MOSES | 3/27/2015 | |||||||
CBCS vs NICHOLE M. MOSES | |||||||||
15CVF00224 | JAMES D REINHARDT | 3/27/2015 | |||||||
CBCS vs JAMES D REINHARDT | |||||||||
14CVG01266 | TONIA HEFLIN, ET AL. | 3/27/2015 | |||||||
SHOWE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION vs TONIA HEFLIN, ET AL. | |||||||||
15CVI00196 | AMBER NEELY | 3/27/2015 | |||||||
SUNDANCE PROPERTY MGMT DBA EAGLE RIDGE APTS. vs AMBER NEELY | |||||||||
15CVF00147 | MICHAEL SEVERT | 3/27/2015 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO vs MICHAEL SEVERT | |||||||||
14CVG00429 | LANA FELTNER, ET AL. | 3/24/2015 | |||||||
SHOWE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION vs LANA FELTNER, ET AL. | |||||||||
14CVG00618 | LAUREN ROBINSON, ET AL. | 3/24/2015 | |||||||
SHOWE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION vs LAUREN ROBINSON, ET AL. | |||||||||
14CVG00968 | RACHEL WALKER, ET AL. | 3/24/2015 | |||||||
SHOWE MANAGEMEN CORP vs RACHEL WALKER, ET AL. | |||||||||
14CVG01118 | JOANIE LYONS, ET AL. | 3/24/2015 | |||||||
SHOWE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION vs JOANIE LYONS, ET AL. | |||||||||
14CVF01582 | CHAD A. HIETT, ET AL. | 3/23/2015 | |||||||
CARROLLTON POINTE APARTMENTS, LL vs CHAD A. HIETT, ET AL. | |||||||||
15CVF00136 | ROXEANNE TORRES | 3/23/2015 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O DISCOVER PRODUCTS, INC. vs ROXEANNE TORRES | |||||||||
15CVF00085 | BRIDGET GASKINS | 3/23/2015 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERIES DBA CENTERVILLE PARK vs BRIDGET GASKINS | |||||||||
15CVF00083 | KIMBERLY A PERKINS | 3/23/2015 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O DISCOVER PRODUCTS, INC. vs KIMBERLY A PERKINS | |||||||||
14CVF01752 | KIMBERLY A. MATHENY | 3/23/2015 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs KIMBERLY A. MATHENY | |||||||||
14CVF00871 | SAMER HAMDAN | 3/23/2015 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs SAMER HAMDAN | |||||||||
14CVF01735 | JASON RICHARDSON | 3/19/2015 | |||||||
NCEP, LLC C/O SLOVIN & ASSOCIATES CO. LPA vs JASON RICHARDSON | |||||||||
14CVF01831 | LAJUANA A. WILLIAMS | 3/19/2015 | |||||||
CBCS vs LAJUANA A. WILLIAMS | |||||||||
15CVF00274 | ELAINE H. ERISMAN | 3/19/2015 | |||||||
CBCS vs ELAINE H. ERISMAN | |||||||||
15CVI00206 | TIMOTHY D. ROY | 3/17/2015 | |||||||
TAMARA L. GRAHAM vs TIMOTHY D. ROY | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 542, 543, 544 ... 564, 565, 566 Next |