11310 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
14CVF01914 | JOEL A WADE | 4/9/2015 | |||||||
CBCS vs JOEL A WADE | |||||||||
15CVF00006 | CARRIE PURDUM (AKA CARRIE A. PURDUM | 4/9/2015 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, NA AS SUCCESSOR TO TARGET NATL BANK vs CARRIE PURDUM (AKA CARRIE A. PUR... | |||||||||
15CVF00060 | MARK SMITH | 4/9/2015 | |||||||
CBCS vs MARK SMITH | |||||||||
15CVF00063 | SUZANNE WENDLING | 4/9/2015 | |||||||
CBCS vs SUZANNE WENDLING | |||||||||
15CVF00275 | BRYANT L. STEELE | 4/9/2015 | |||||||
CBCS vs BRYANT L. STEELE | |||||||||
14CVF01834 | BILLY W. WRIGHT | 4/9/2015 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs BILLY W. WRIGHT | |||||||||
07CVH01835 | MEGAN B. PORTER | 4/7/2015 | |||||||
UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTION vs MEGAN B. PORTER | |||||||||
15CVI00153 | LINDA EUSTACHE | 4/1/2015 | |||||||
AA CRAVEN BAIL BONDS vs LINDA EUSTACHE | |||||||||
04CVH01201 | ADELE R BORNS | 4/1/2015 | |||||||
GREAT SENECA FINANCIAL vs ADELE R BORNS | |||||||||
14CVG01657 | JULLETTE SAMUELS, ET AL. | 4/1/2015 | |||||||
MASTROIENI PROPERTIES, LLC C/O HELEN TORMEY vs JULLETTE SAMUELS, ET AL. | |||||||||
15CVF00119 | JEFFREY BOWLIN | 4/1/2015 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC C/O RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES L vs JEFFREY BOWLIN | |||||||||
14CVF00710 | SHANNON VIETS | 3/31/2015 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING D vs SHANNON VIETS | |||||||||
14CVF01471 | NAJWA SALEH | 3/31/2015 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs NAJWA SALEH | |||||||||
14CVF01867 | DANIELLE FORD | 3/31/2015 | |||||||
SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES OF OHIO, INC vs DANIELLE FORD | |||||||||
14CVF01905 | DOROTHY V CAPERS | 3/31/2015 | |||||||
DAVID M. ZAPF, D.O., INC. vs DOROTHY V CAPERS | |||||||||
14CVF01913 | BONITA G. SMITH | 3/31/2015 | |||||||
CBCS vs BONITA G. SMITH | |||||||||
15CVF00086 | LINDSEY B. SHORES | 3/31/2015 | |||||||
AMERICAN KIDNEY STONE MANAGEMENT vs LINDSEY B. SHORES | |||||||||
14CVF01480 | TIFFANY N. TINGLE | 3/30/2015 | |||||||
CACH, LLC vs TIFFANY N. TINGLE | |||||||||
14CVF01857 | BLAKE DURHAM | 3/27/2015 | |||||||
CBCS vs BLAKE DURHAM | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 541, 542, 543 ... 564, 565, 566 Next |