11310 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
15CVF00490 | ELLEN BOWMAN | 5/14/2015 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs ELLEN BOWMAN | |||||||||
15CVF00444 | VICTORIA A REILLY | 5/14/2015 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs VICTORIA A REILLY | |||||||||
15CVI00193 | JONATHAN BERGERSON C/O PRODUCTION TURNING | 5/13/2015 | |||||||
SUNDANCE PROPERTY MGMT FOR EAGLE RIDGE APTS vs JONATHAN BERGERSON C/O PRODUCTION TUR... | |||||||||
15CVI00310 | CAROL FINNELL | 5/13/2015 | |||||||
BARBARA CHOU (POWLETTE) vs CAROL FINNELL | |||||||||
15CVI00476 | DEVEN WANNAMAKER | 5/13/2015 | |||||||
SCOTT GLADIN vs DEVEN WANNAMAKER | |||||||||
15CVF00064 | ADAM GREEN (AKA ADAM R. GREEN) | 5/12/2015 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs ADAM GREEN (AKA ADAM R. GREEN) | |||||||||
14CVF01641 | SUZANNE NORTHCUTT | 5/8/2015 | |||||||
CHERYL HAGEMAN vs SUZANNE NORTHCUTT | |||||||||
15CVF00348 | BRADLEY MUNDHENK | 5/6/2015 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs BRADLEY MUNDHENK | |||||||||
15CVI00346 | JOSE ANGEL CAMACHO ESPINOZA | 5/6/2015 | |||||||
MARTIN J. GRUNDER JR. DBA GRUNDER LANDSCAPING CO. vs JOSE ANGEL CAMACHO ESPINOZA | |||||||||
15CVF00352 | LARRY E. HARRIS | 5/6/2015 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs LARRY E. HARRIS | |||||||||
15CVF00084 | DORI M. MOSS | 5/6/2015 | |||||||
SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES OF OHIO, INC. vs DORI M. MOSS | |||||||||
14CVF01916 | BENJAMIN S ALFORD AKA BENJAMIN STEVEN ALFOR | 5/6/2015 | |||||||
STERLING INC vs BENJAMIN S ALFORD aka BENJAMIN STEVEN ALFOR | |||||||||
14CVF01788 | HOPE STIDHAM | 5/6/2015 | |||||||
HEIGHTS FINANCE CORPORATION FURNITURE WORLD vs HOPE STIDHAM | |||||||||
15CVH00638 | DON PETIT, REGISTAR | 4/30/2015 | |||||||
WILLIAM J RUDDY vs DON PETIT, REGISTAR | |||||||||
15CVF00007 | RAYMOND T. TYNER | 4/27/2015 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO vs RAYMOND T. TYNER | |||||||||
15CVI00200 | ANTHONY J DIGIORGIO JR | 4/10/2015 | |||||||
AARON BURNS vs ANTHONY J DIGIORGIO JR | |||||||||
14CVF01314 | CLYDE A. WEBB | 4/9/2015 | |||||||
STATE OF OHIO DEPT. OF JOB & FAMILY SERV. C/O GREG A. GOLDBLA vs CLYDE A. WEBB | |||||||||
14CVF01356 | DANIEL S FOOSE | 4/9/2015 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs DANIEL S FOOSE | |||||||||
14CVF01747 | KAYLEIGH B ROBERTS | 4/9/2015 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O DB SERVICING CORPORATION vs KAYLEIGH B ROBERTS | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 540, 541, 542 ... 564, 565, 566 Next |