11310 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
15CVF00627 | TISHA L. ROSSER | 6/1/2015 | |||||||
STERLING JEWELERS INC. DBA JARED-GALLERIA OF JEWELRY vs TISHA L. ROSSER | |||||||||
14CVF01900 | DOUGLAS ANDERSON | 6/1/2015 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING D vs DOUGLAS ANDERSON | |||||||||
15CVF00577 | MELISSA A THEIS | 5/27/2015 | |||||||
WRIGHT-PATT CREDIT UNION vs MELISSA A THEIS | |||||||||
15CVI00445 | CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL HARPER | 5/21/2015 | |||||||
HEATHER PAGE vs CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL HARPER | |||||||||
15CVF00285 | WILLIAM P KEMPER | 5/20/2015 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NA vs WILLIAM P KEMPER | |||||||||
15CVF00399 | JAMES T BROCK | 5/20/2015 | |||||||
CACH, LLC vs JAMES T BROCK | |||||||||
15CVF00138 | STEPHEN LARRICK | 5/15/2015 | |||||||
PCA ACQUISITIONS V, LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs STEPHEN LARRICK | |||||||||
15CVF00450 | LAURA BURKE | 5/15/2015 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs LAURA BURKE | |||||||||
15CVF00363 | VERNON CLARK | 5/15/2015 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DB IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs VERNON CLARK | |||||||||
15CVF00347 | MELISSA PORTORREAL | 5/15/2015 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs MELISSA PORTORREAL | |||||||||
15CVF00341 | BRIAN POIRIER | 5/15/2015 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs BRIAN POIRIER | |||||||||
15CVF00325 | TONYA SEALEY | 5/15/2015 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs TONYA SEALEY | |||||||||
15CVF00226 | LAMONT J. HANCOCK | 5/15/2015 | |||||||
SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES OF OHIO, INC vs LAMONT J. HANCOCK | |||||||||
15CVF00030 | HEATHER L HURTE | 5/15/2015 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES LLC vs HEATHER L HURTE | |||||||||
14CVF01873 | JAMES W. BELL | 5/15/2015 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs JAMES W. BELL | |||||||||
14CVF01441 | CAROLYN WOODS | 5/15/2015 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO INC vs CAROLYN WOODS | |||||||||
14CVF01431 | SHAWN P. ADDIS | 5/15/2015 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) , N.A. vs SHAWN P. ADDIS | |||||||||
14CVF01836 | DORSEY STIDHAM | 5/14/2015 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs DORSEY STIDHAM | |||||||||
15CVF00157 | PAMELA CASEY | 5/14/2015 | |||||||
RADIOLOGY PHYSICIANS INC. C/O SLOVIN & ASSOCIATE CO. LPA vs PAMELA CASEY | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 539, 540, 541 ... 564, 565, 566 Next |