11344 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
15CVF00452 | RANDY SUTTON | 8/14/2015 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs RANDY SUTTON | |||||||||
07CVH02631 | JESSE L. RECKER | 8/14/2015 | |||||||
JOHN SOLIDAY FINANCIAL GROUP C/O CHEEK & ZEEHANDELAR vs JESSE L. RECKER | |||||||||
15CVF00377 | ELVA MCKINNEY (AKA ELVA B. MCKINNEY) | 8/14/2015 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs ELVA MCKINNEY (AKA ELVA B. MC... | |||||||||
15CVF00283 | MATHIEU C. HUBIN | 8/13/2015 | |||||||
KETTERING ANESTHESIA ASSOC INC vs MATHIEU C. HUBIN | |||||||||
15CVF00687 | AFETSI E AIDAM | 8/13/2015 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES LLC vs AFETSI E AIDAM | |||||||||
15CVI00828 | ANTHONY MANTINE | 8/13/2015 | |||||||
SETTLERS WALK HOME OWNERS ASSOC, C/O TOWNE PROPERTIES vs ANTHONY MANTINE | |||||||||
08CVH02305 | SABIR HAMDAN | 8/11/2015 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES vs SABIR HAMDAN | |||||||||
15CVF00595 | STEPHANIE D ABNER | 8/10/2015 | |||||||
UNIFUND CCR, LLC vs STEPHANIE D ABNER | |||||||||
15CVI00194 | TISHA LANKFORD | 8/10/2015 | |||||||
SUNDANCE PROPERTY MGMT FOR EAGLE RIDGE APTS vs TISHA LANKFORD | |||||||||
15CVF00917 | JEFFREY P. CROOKS, SR, ET AL | 8/10/2015 | |||||||
KETTERING MEDICAL CENTER vs JEFFREY P. CROOKS, SR, ET AL | |||||||||
15CVF00714 | KYLE R THOMAS | 8/10/2015 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs KYLE R THOMAS | |||||||||
15CVF00525 | RACHEL HOSKINS | 8/10/2015 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs RACHEL HOSKINS | |||||||||
15CVF00514 | TAMMARIA COLE, AKA TAMMARIA A. COLE | 8/10/2015 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs TAMMARIA COLE, AKA TAMMARIA A... | |||||||||
14CVF01510 | AMY L. HONIOUS AKA AMY L. HINSHAW | 8/10/2015 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, NA AS SUCCESSOR TO TARGET NATL BANK vs AMY L. HONIOUS AKA AMY L. HINSHA... | |||||||||
15CVF00199 | MARY A. THACKER | 7/29/2015 | |||||||
SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES OF OHIO, INC. vs MARY A. THACKER | |||||||||
15CVI00833 | GERALD RICHARDSON | 7/29/2015 | |||||||
SETTLERS WALK HOME OWNERS ASSOC, C/O TOWNE PROPERTIES vs GERALD RICHARDSON | |||||||||
15CVI00840 | SARAH DUNCAN | 7/29/2015 | |||||||
SETTLERS WALK HOME OWNERS ASSOC, C/O TOWNE PROPERTIES vs SARAH DUNCAN | |||||||||
14CVF01357 | ASHLEY SWANSON | 7/28/2015 | |||||||
CACH, LLC vs ASHLEY SWANSON | |||||||||
14CVF01647 | NICKOLAS SCOTT | 7/28/2015 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs NICKOLAS SCOTT | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 534, 535, 536 ... 566, 567, 568 Next |