11344 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
15CVF00967 | ANNETTA NEWTON | 9/29/2015 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O DISCOVER PRODUCTS INC. vs ANNETTA NEWTON | |||||||||
15CVF00872 | VICKI L WEISBRODT | 9/28/2015 | |||||||
CBCS vs VICKI L WEISBRODT | |||||||||
15CVF01011 | DAWN WILLIAMS-BROYLES | 9/28/2015 | |||||||
CARROLLTON POINTE APARTMENTS, LL vs DAWN WILLIAMS-BROYLES | |||||||||
15CVF00166 | LAURA BURKE | 9/10/2015 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs LAURA BURKE | |||||||||
15CVH01235 | DON PETIT REGISTRAR | 9/2/2015 | |||||||
TIMOTHY MCGLOTHIN vs DON PETIT REGISTRAR | |||||||||
15CVF00106 | JOSEPH M. FURMAN | 8/28/2015 | |||||||
ERIE INSURANCE CO vs JOSEPH M. FURMAN | |||||||||
15CVF00319 | ANTHONY EDMONDS | 8/28/2015 | |||||||
SUNDANCE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT vs ANTHONY EDMONDS | |||||||||
15CVF00539 | PATRICIA A RAWLINS | 8/28/2015 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs PATRICIA A RAWLINS | |||||||||
15CVF00581 | STEPHEN RAMEY, ET AL | 8/28/2015 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC ASSIGNEE OF SPRINGLEAF FIN SVC vs STEPHEN RAMEY, ET AL | |||||||||
15CVF00918 | AZURE R. DEAN | 8/28/2015 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs AZURE R. DEAN | |||||||||
15CVF00974 | VANESSA K. OLIVER | 8/28/2015 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs VANESSA K. OLIVER | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 532, 533, 534 ... 566, 567, 568 Next |