Daily Law Journal
11344 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number Defendant Date
15CVF01141 DEBBIE STAMM 10/6/2015
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs DEBBIE STAMM
15CVF01147 STEPHEN G. UMSTOT 10/5/2015
CBCS vs STEPHEN G. UMSTOT
15CVF01224 TERRY SANGER 10/5/2015
WEBBANK, FINGERHUT REVOLVING C/O KIRSCHENBAUM, PHILLIPS, vs TERRY SANGER
15CVE00371 KENYA TAYLOR 10/2/2015
WESTFIELD NATIONAL INSURANCE CO. SUBROGEE OF JAMES HOLTHAUS vs KENYA TAYLOR
15CVF00713 TERRY W GEKELER 10/2/2015
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs TERRY W GEKELER
15CVF00824 HEATHER TAYLOR 10/2/2015
DISCOVER BANK C/O DISCOVER PRODUCTS, INC. vs HEATHER TAYLOR
15CVF01083 KAREN L. MARSH 10/2/2015
CBCS vs KAREN L. MARSH
15CVF01084 VICKEY PLACE 10/2/2015
CBCS vs VICKEY PLACE
15CVF00572 KATHLEEN M LUCAS 10/1/2015
UNIFUND CCR, LLC vs KATHLEEN M LUCAS
15CVF01017 JENNIFER L SELBY 10/1/2015
DISCOVER BANK C/O DISCOVER PRODUCTS, INC. vs JENNIFER L SELBY
15CVF01014 JACQUELINE MONIQUE MAXWELL 10/1/2015
MOTORISTS MUTUAL INS CO C/O ZEEHANDELAR, SABATINO & ASSO vs JACQUELINE MONIQUE MA...
15CVF00756 SHARI HARP 10/1/2015
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING vs SHARI HARP
15CVF00685 JULIUS R HALL 10/1/2015
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs JULIUS R HALL
15CVF00684 TODD P CARTER 10/1/2015
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs TODD P CARTER
15CVF00657 WILLIAM SWEENEY 10/1/2015
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs WILLIAM SWEENEY
15CVF00547 JESUS OROZCO 10/1/2015
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs JESUS OROZCO
15CVF00339 PATRICIA A COPPEL 10/1/2015
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NA vs PATRICIA A COPPEL
15CVI01174 ERIC HALL 9/30/2015
FERCO TECH CORPORATION vs ERIC HALL
15CVF00489 JULIUS G. CANTRELL JR 9/29/2015
WRIGHT-PATT CREDIT UNION vs JULIUS G. CANTRELL JR

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 531, 532, 533 ... 566, 567, 568  Next