Daily Law Journal
11344 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number Defendant Date
15CVG00215 KIM TAYLOR, ET AL. 11/24/2015
O.L. GARRISON vs KIM TAYLOR, ET AL.
15CVG00510 BRITTANY GETER, ET AL. 11/24/2015
BARTON L. WILSON vs BRITTANY GETER, ET AL.
15CVG00561 MIKE LOFTON, ET AL. 11/24/2015
O.L. GARRISON vs MIKE LOFTON, ET AL.
15CVG00661 JAMES BREWER, ET AL. 11/24/2015
O.L. GARRISON vs JAMES BREWER, ET AL.
15CVG00927 TONYA BENNETT, ET AL 11/24/2015
SHOWE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION DBA COVEY RUN APARTMENTS vs TONYA BENNETT, ET AL
15CVG01051 BARBARA SMITH, ET AL 11/24/2015
SHOWE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION vs BARBARA SMITH, ET AL
15CVF01419 AMANDA G WALKER 11/24/2015
CACH, LLC vs AMANDA G WALKER
15CVI01338 BRYSON WITT 11/5/2015
DEBORAH BAILEY vs BRYSON WITT
15CVF00486 DENNIS W BROWN 11/4/2015
JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIE vs DENNIS W BROWN
15CVI01340 JAMIE KUNTZ 11/3/2015
INTERSTATE FORD, INC. vs JAMIE KUNTZ
14CVE01629 VICTORIA A. RAMSEY 10/22/2015
ALLSTATE FIRE & CASUALTY INS. CO vs VICTORIA A. RAMSEY
15CVF00662 GEORGE SHAWVER 10/22/2015
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs GEORGE SHAWVER
15CVF00689 LYNNA PERRY 10/22/2015
MSW CAPITAL, LLC C/O KIRSCHENBAUM, PHILLIPA & vs LYNNA PERRY
15CVF00879 CHRISTOPHER E LAMB 10/22/2015
MIDLAND FUNDING DE LLC vs CHRISTOPHER E LAMB
15CVF00979 STEPHANIE MORTER, ET AL 10/22/2015
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs STEPHANIE MORTER, ET AL
15CVF01016 R G GOODWIN, AKA ROBERT GRANT GOODWI 10/22/2015
CAPITAL ONE, N.A. vs R G GOODWIN, AKA ROBERT GRANT GOODWI

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 529, 530, 531 ... 566, 567, 568  Next