11344 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
15CVF01140 | ELAINE PATRICK | 12/10/2015 | |||||||
JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIE vs ELAINE PATRICK | |||||||||
15CVF01356 | JENNIFER ST AMAND AKA JENNIFER A. STAMAND | 12/10/2015 | |||||||
ALLGATE FINANCIAL ASSIGNEE OF US BANK vs JENNIFER ST AMAND AKA JENNIFER A. STAMAND | |||||||||
15CVF01440 | JANET BAUGHMAN A/K/A JANET L BAUGHMAN | 12/10/2015 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES, LLC vs JANET BAUGHMAN A/K/A JANE... | |||||||||
15CVF00915 | MICHAEL R. SCHMIDT AKA RAY SCHMIDT | 12/10/2015 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. SUCC. TO CITIBANK (SD), N.A. vs MICHAEL R. SCHMIDT AKA RAY SCHMIDT | |||||||||
15CVF01192 | DENNIS NADOLSKY, AKA DENNIS MICHAEL | 12/9/2015 | |||||||
WELLS FARGO FINANACIAL NATIONAL BANK vs DENNIS NADOLSKY, AKA DENNIS MICHAEL | |||||||||
15CVF01442 | JAMIE LEE MCNUTT | 12/8/2015 | |||||||
FRANKLIN UNIVERSITY vs JAMIE LEE MCNUTT | |||||||||
15CVF00289 | SHANIECE S. HARRIS | 12/7/2015 | |||||||
WRIGHT-PATT CREDIT UNION vs SHANIECE S. HARRIS | |||||||||
15CVF01111 | JEREMY D. BROCK | 11/24/2015 | |||||||
SECURITY NATIONAL BANK, DIVISION OF THE PARK NATIONAL BA vs JEREMY D. BROCK | |||||||||
15CVF01269 | CYNTHIA STAMMEN | 11/24/2015 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK C/O ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C. vs CYNTHIA STAMME... | |||||||||
15CVF01335 | GRETA M HENZ | 11/24/2015 | |||||||
CACH, LLC vs GRETA M HENZ | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 528, 529, 530 ... 566, 567, 568 Next |