11344 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVF2401243 | STUEVE, JEFFREY WILLIAM | 4/15/2025 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. vs STUEVE, JEFFREY WILLIAM | |||||||||
CVF2401981 | GORMAN, STEPHANIE | 4/14/2025 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs GORMAN, STEPHANIE | |||||||||
CVF2400941 | EDWARDS, BRANDON C | 4/14/2025 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs EDWARDS, BRANDON C | |||||||||
CVF2401750 | DURANT, GABRIELLE L | 4/14/2025 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE NA vs DURANT, GABRIELLE L | |||||||||
CVF2401764 | PATE, KRISTEN M | 4/14/2025 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE NA vs PATE, KRISTEN M | |||||||||
CVG2500053 | TAYLOR, SHELBY | 4/14/2025 | |||||||
MONARCH INVESTMENT & MGMT GRP vs TAYLOR, SHELBY | |||||||||
CVF2402189 | SMITH, DANA N | 4/14/2025 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE NA vs SMITH, DANA N | |||||||||
CVF2402113 | BREWER, LIZA | 4/14/2025 | |||||||
JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, NA vs BREWER, LIZA | |||||||||
CVF2402053 | BRG APARTMENTS | 4/14/2025 | |||||||
MERRY, JANELL vs BRG APARTMENTS | |||||||||
CVG2500605 | YOUNG, NORMAN | 4/14/2025 | |||||||
SL FLATS OWNER, LLC AND vs YOUNG, NORMAN | |||||||||
CVH2402129 | SULLIVAN DDS, MICHAEL A | 4/11/2025 | |||||||
ELLIOTT, KIM vs SULLIVAN DDS, MICHAEL A | |||||||||
CVG2400855 | MOORE, LEAN N. | 4/11/2025 | |||||||
HIMMELBERG, LEANN vs MOORE, LEAN N. | |||||||||
CVF2500541 | RAY, JENNIFER | 4/11/2025 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs RAY, JENNIFER | |||||||||
CVF2402188 | TARTER, ALEX | 4/10/2025 | |||||||
CITIBANK NA vs TARTER, ALEX | |||||||||
CVG2500639 | HOWARD, MACAILA | 4/9/2025 | |||||||
FOCUS PM, LLC vs HOWARD, MACAILA | |||||||||
CVG2500526 | DURRENEE, ROBERTA | 4/8/2025 | |||||||
WEST CARROLLTON MHC, LP vs DURRENEE, ROBERTA | |||||||||
CVF2500164 | FREEZE, MELVIN | 4/8/2025 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs FREEZE, MELVIN | |||||||||
CVF2500151 | KUNATEH, A SHAIBU | 4/8/2025 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs KUNATEH, A SHAIBU | |||||||||
CVF2402252 | SAETTEL, NICHOLAS | 4/8/2025 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs SAETTEL, NICHOLAS | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 5, 6, 7 ... 566, 567, 568 Next |