Daily Law Journal
12279 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Assignments
Case Number Defendant Date
16CVI01445 DON JAMES 11/22/2016
RICK JOHN vs DON JAMES
16CVI01449 KATALYN LAPOINTE 11/22/2016
MISSI BARRACLOUGH vs KATALYN LAPOINTE
14CVF01820 KAREN WEBB 11/22/2016
SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES OF OHIO, INC. vs KAREN WEBB
16CVG00415 TOINETTE GAITHER, ET AL. 11/22/2016
SIX EAGLES ENTERPRISES, LLC vs TOINETTE GAITHER, ET AL.
04CVF00268 MARION FOX 11/22/2016
CREDIT INVESTMNT INC vs MARION FOX
16CVG01211 JENNIFER WEYBRIGHT, ET AL WOODFORD WEYBRIGHT, ET A... 11/22/2016
JEFFERY RICHMOND vs JENNIFER WEYBRIGHT, ET AL WOODFORD WEYBRIGHT, ET A...
16CVE00925 EMILY BOGAN 11/22/2016
GBOLAHAN ODULATE vs EMILY BOGAN
16CVF00984 JEANIE HANSHELL 11/22/2016
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs JEANIE HANSHELL
16CVI01440 BRIAN BOGGS BRIGETTE HALL TURNER 11/22/2016
LIN BART INVESTMENTS LLC vs BRIAN BOGGS BRIGETTE HALL TURNER
11CVH01180 RACHAEL V LEWIS 11/21/2016
DISCOVER BANK C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES vs RACHAEL V LEWIS
11/21/2016
vs
10CVE00796 ALLEN W. PATRICK 11/21/2016
DAYTON POWER & LIGHT COMPANY vs ALLEN W. PATRICK
09CVH02061 MARK S. HAGGARD 11/21/2016
CITIBANK N.A. SUCCESSOR TO CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA), N.A. vs MARK S. HAGGARD
07CVH01106 VALERIE D. CHISOLM 11/18/2016
ELITE RECOVERY SERVICES vs VALERIE D. CHISOLM
16CVG01113 AMANDA ROLLINS, ET AL 11/17/2016
SHOWE MANAGEMENT CORPORATION DBA COVEY RUN APARTMENTS vs AMANDA ROLLINS, ET AL
05CVH02052 JAMES C FELTS 11/15/2016
STONE CREEK FINANCIAL, INC. vs JAMES C FELTS
01CVF01194 PATRICIA CALKINS 11/15/2016
CREDIT INVESTMENTS INC vs PATRICIA CALKINS
16CVF00519 JAMES M. ROGERS AND KIMBERLY A. SAVIN 11/15/2016
MIDUSA CREDIT UNION INC. vs JAMES M. ROGERS and KIMBERLY A. SAVIN
16CVG01542 ASHLEY SEWARD, ET. AL 11/15/2016
STEVE KRENNING vs ASHLEY SEWARD, ET. AL

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 600, 601, 602 ... 612, 613, 614  Next