12130 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
12CVH00954 | CLINTON E HOLTGREVEN | 11/5/2016 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NA vs CLINTON E HOLTGREVEN | |||||||||
16CVG01401 | RUSSELL SCOTT WILSON, ET. AL | 11/3/2016 | |||||||
SECRETARY OF VETERANS AFFAIRS C/O LERNER, SAMPSON & ROTHFUSS vs RUSSELL SCOTT WILSON,... | |||||||||
16CVI01282 | PAYLESS FURNITURE | 11/1/2016 | |||||||
LAMAR ADVERTISING vs PAYLESS FURNITURE | |||||||||
16CVF00145 | TAMBRIA S. ACKERMAN | 11/1/2016 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs TAMBRIA S. ACKERMAN | |||||||||
15CVF01553 | KAMI COLE AKA KAMI COMBS/KEENER AND DAVID COLE | 11/1/2016 | |||||||
NTL COLLEGIATE STNDT LN TRST 2006-01 vs KAMI COLE AKA KAMI COMBS/KEENER and DAVID COL... | |||||||||
16CVG01271 | SHAWN AYERS, ET. AL | 11/1/2016 | |||||||
RONALD HEDGER vs SHAWN AYERS, ET. AL | |||||||||
16CVG00156 | STACY BAKER AND JOHNATHAN NOBLE | 11/1/2016 | |||||||
RODNEY D. MULLINS vs STACY BAKER and JOHNATHAN NOBLE | |||||||||
16CVI01305 | BRITTANY LADD | 11/1/2016 | |||||||
MATT SWANSON and TASHA SWANSON vs BRITTANY LADD | |||||||||
16CVI01280 | CRAIG BARCOMB | 11/1/2016 | |||||||
MILZY MOTORSPORTS, LLC vs CRAIG BARCOMB | |||||||||
16CVG01396 | DELANE HOWELL, ET. AL | 11/1/2016 | |||||||
CARL CULL vs DELANE HOWELL, ET. AL | |||||||||
16CVG01450 | DAWN BOSTICK, ET. AL | 11/1/2016 | |||||||
O.L. GARRISON vs DAWN BOSTICK, ET. AL | |||||||||
16CVG01495 | JUANITA PRESTON, ET. AL | 11/1/2016 | |||||||
HUNTERS CHASE DAYTON LLC DBA HUNTERS CHASE APARTMENTS vs JUANITA PRESTON, ET. AL | |||||||||
16CVG01471 | JAMES PURSIFULL, ET AL. | 11/1/2016 | |||||||
MAD RIVER APARTMENTS DAYTON, LLC vs JAMES PURSIFULL, ET AL. | |||||||||
16CVG01456 | CHRISTINA MARIE BUSH SIMONES, ET. AL | 11/1/2016 | |||||||
BARRY W BURROUGHS vs CHRISTINA MARIE BUSH SIMONES, ET. AL | |||||||||
16CVF00581 | JONATHAN WADE | 11/1/2016 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC FORMER OBLIGEE OF CREDIT ONE BANK, NA vs JONATHAN WADE | |||||||||
16CVF01350 | KAREN S MCDANIEL | 10/31/2016 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES, LLC vs KAREN S MCDANIEL | |||||||||
16CVF00916 | KEVIN E HETZER | 10/25/2016 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES, LLC vs KEVIN E HETZER | |||||||||
16CVG01444 | LARRY ALTHOUSE, ET. AL AND MEGAN ALTHOUSE, ET. AL | 10/25/2016 | |||||||
ART PARADISE, INC. vs LARRY ALTHOUSE, ET. AL and MEGAN ALTHOUSE, ET. AL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 594, 595, 596 ... 605, 606, 607 Next |