12279 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
17CVG00046 | JUAN C RAMOS | 1/24/2017 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA CENTERVILLE PARK APTS., LLC vs JUAN C RAMOS | |||||||||
16CVF00696 | BRUCE SELNICK GREATER CINCINNATI APARTMENT MANA... | 1/24/2017 | |||||||
SPIRO KARABALIS DBA DAYTON LANDSCAPING vs BRUCE SELNICK GREATER CINCINNATI APART... | |||||||||
13CVF01228 | ROBERT L STACY | 1/24/2017 | |||||||
ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC vs ROBERT L STACY | |||||||||
09CVH00449 | HEATHER R KELHOFFER | 1/24/2017 | |||||||
FIRST RESOLUTION INVESTMENT CORP C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES, LLC vs HEATHER R KELHOFFER... | |||||||||
10CVH01455 | DREW M HEDLESON | 1/24/2017 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, NA AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST vs DREW M HEDLESON | |||||||||
16CVI01543 | VICTORIA BLAKE | 1/24/2017 | |||||||
SANDY OTERO LUIS OTERO vs VICTORIA BLAKE | |||||||||
16CVI01638 | F&F TREE SERVICE C/O OLUWAFEMI OANICE ISELAIYE | 1/24/2017 | |||||||
DENNIS L. CARLSEN vs F&F TREE SERVICE C/O OLUWAFEMI OANICE ISELAIYE | |||||||||
17CVG00051 | ANDREW HOCK, ET. AL | 1/24/2017 | |||||||
MAD RIVER APARTMENTS vs ANDREW HOCK, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVG00048 | DAMON LANE, ET AL. | 1/24/2017 | |||||||
DAYTON SPRING VALLEY PARTNERS, L PRESERVE AT SAGEBROOK vs DAMON LANE, ET AL. | |||||||||
17CVG00047 | JAMES THOMAS, ET AL. | 1/24/2017 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA CENTERVILLE PARK APTS., LLC vs JAMES THOMAS, ET AL. | |||||||||
17CVG00044 | KIMBERLY STRICKLIN, ET. AL | 1/24/2017 | |||||||
CMC PROPERTIES vs KIMBERLY STRICKLIN, ET. AL | |||||||||
04CVH01716 | LADEAN J FARRIS | 1/20/2017 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ASSIGNEE OF BENEFICIAL OHIO INC. vs LADEAN J FARRIS | |||||||||
16CVG01801 | KATRINA M. ALSEPT, ET. AL JEFFREY T. ROARK, ET. ... | 1/19/2017 | |||||||
TAMARA L. MAKELA vs KATRINA M. ALSEPT, ET. AL JEFFREY T. ROARK, ET. ... | |||||||||
99CVF01305 | 1/18/2017 | ||||||||
H&S FINANCIAL INC. vs | |||||||||
10CVH00234 | 1/18/2017 | ||||||||
FRIENDLY FINANCE CORPORATION vs | |||||||||
05CVF01101 | 1/18/2017 | ||||||||
OHIO RECEIVABLES LLC vs | |||||||||
08CVH02912 | 1/18/2017 | ||||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs | |||||||||
04CVH01256 | 1/18/2017 | ||||||||
PALISADES COLLECTION LLC vs | |||||||||
10CVF02423 | 1/17/2017 | ||||||||
OHIO RECEIVABLES LLC C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES, LLC vs | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 589, 590, 591 ... 612, 613, 614 Next |