12279 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
17CVG00150 | CHRISTOPHER PEARSON, ET. AL | 2/23/2017 | |||||||
BERKSHIRE REALTY GROUP, LLC DBA CROWN WOODHILLS APTS. vs CHRISTOPHER PEARSON, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVG00181 | CARLOS UHCZA, ET. AL | 2/21/2017 | |||||||
TSM PROPERTIES LTD. vs CARLOS UHCZA, ET. AL | |||||||||
16CVG00347 | DONNA S. TOWNSEND, ET AL. | 2/21/2017 | |||||||
EAGLE RIDGE APARTMENTS C/O SUNDANCE PROPERTY MGMT, INC. vs DONNA S. TOWNSEND, ET AL. | |||||||||
16CVI01852 | CARMAR INVESTMENTS | 2/21/2017 | |||||||
AK LAWN & LANDSCAPING, LLC vs CARMAR INVESTMENTS | |||||||||
17CVG00216 | JOHN ENGLISH, ET. AL | 2/21/2017 | |||||||
ROBERT J RECK vs JOHN ENGLISH, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVG00215 | YAHAIRA PANTOJA, ET AL. | 2/21/2017 | |||||||
FARMERS, LTD vs YAHAIRA PANTOJA, ET AL. | |||||||||
17CVG00214 | DAVID ROWLAND, ET. AL | 2/21/2017 | |||||||
ROBERT RECK vs DAVID ROWLAND, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVG00209 | STARR WOOD, ET. AL | 2/21/2017 | |||||||
CONSOLIDATED IV, LLC DBA THE KNOLLS APARTMENTS vs STARR WOOD, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVG00198 | TOM COOK, ET. AL | 2/21/2017 | |||||||
MARY E BRYANT vs TOM COOK, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVG00197 | CARLA SMITH, ET AL. | 2/21/2017 | |||||||
PSP IDEAL MOBILE HOME PARK, LLC vs CARLA SMITH, ET AL. | |||||||||
17CVG00196 | DAVID FLANAGAN, ET. AL | 2/21/2017 | |||||||
PSP IDEAL MOBILE HOME PARK, LLC vs DAVID FLANAGAN, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVG00195 | HEATHER MCCORMICK, ET. AL | 2/21/2017 | |||||||
MIAMISBURG CENTRAL APTS DBA SOUTHLAND VILLAGE APTS. vs HEATHER MCCORMICK, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVG00194 | ASHLEY JAYNES, ET. AL | 2/21/2017 | |||||||
MIAMISBURG CENTRAL APTS., LTD. DBA SOUTHLAND VILLAGE APTS. vs ASHLEY JAYNES, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVG00191 | SAM OAKLAIN, ET. AL | 2/21/2017 | |||||||
BROOKLYNN GROVE vs SAM OAKLAIN, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVG00077 | KIM FOXX, ET. AL AND ODYSSEY GORDON, ET. AL | 2/17/2017 | |||||||
LESLIE DAVIS vs KIM FOXX, ET. AL and ODYSSEY GORDON, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVG00066 | TAMARA KOSLOSKEY, ET. AL AND ANDREW KOSLOSKEY, ET.... | 2/9/2017 | |||||||
PAUL MORAN PROPERTIES, LLC DBA PROMUS PROPERTIES, LLC vs TAMARA KOSLOSKEY, ET. AL an... | |||||||||
17CVG00087 | MELISSA SHAFFER, ET. AL | 2/7/2017 | |||||||
HUNTERS CHASE DAYTON LLC DBA HUNTERS CHASE APARTMENTS vs MELISSA SHAFFER, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVG00090 | NICOLE WEIKERT, ET. AL | 2/7/2017 | |||||||
ARNOLD SMITH vs NICOLE WEIKERT, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVG00095 | JOHN GRIFFITH, ET. AL | 2/7/2017 | |||||||
RON WAKER vs JOHN GRIFFITH, ET. AL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 585, 586, 587 ... 612, 613, 614 Next |