12279 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
16CVE00183 | BELL'S PREFERRED RESTORATION C/O DOUGLAS BELL AND ... | 4/11/2017 | |||||||
J-ANNE MASONRY, LLC vs BELL'S PREFERRED RESTORATION C/O DOUGLAS BELL AND ... | |||||||||
17CVI00296 | MICHAEL SOULE OF SOULE SOLUTIONS | 4/11/2017 | |||||||
TAYLOR TUCKER vs MICHAEL SOULE OF SOULE SOLUTIONS | |||||||||
17CVI00308 | MINDY KIRK | 4/11/2017 | |||||||
GERALD E GUNNOE vs MINDY KIRK | |||||||||
16CVG01528 | ANGELA MARKS, ET AL | 4/11/2017 | |||||||
MEAFELIA B. PASCUAL vs ANGELA MARKS, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVG00844 | JASON GRIFFIN, ET AL | 4/11/2017 | |||||||
O.L. GARRISON vs JASON GRIFFIN, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVG00845 | TROY HULL, ET AL | 4/11/2017 | |||||||
O.L. GARRISON vs TROY HULL, ET AL | |||||||||
16CVG01255 | MONIQUE MUSTAFA, ET. AL AND KHALID MUSTAFA, ET. AL | 4/11/2017 | |||||||
JAMIE L. SMITH vs MONIQUE MUSTAFA, ET. AL AND KHALID MUSTAFA, ET. AL | |||||||||
16CVG01801 | KATRINA M. ALSEPT, ET. AL AND JEFFREY T. ROARK, ET... | 4/11/2017 | |||||||
TAMARA L. MAKELA vs KATRINA M. ALSEPT, ET. AL AND JEFFREY T. ROARK, ET... | |||||||||
17CVG00507 | CHELBI KIDD, ET. AL | 4/11/2017 | |||||||
KEN KRAUS vs CHELBI KIDD, ET. AL | |||||||||
06CVH01019 | BRIAN MILLER | 4/10/2017 | |||||||
VELOCITY INVESTMENT LLC B vs BRIAN MILLER | |||||||||
16CVF00517 | MARTHA SHOENFELT | 4/7/2017 | |||||||
KETTERING HEALTH NETWORK vs MARTHA SHOENFELT | |||||||||
17CVG00390 | TOM WEEKS, ET AL. | 4/6/2017 | |||||||
R&S RECK MHD vs TOM WEEKS, ET AL. | |||||||||
17CVF00088 | JEROME C. CHAMBERS, SR. | 4/4/2017 | |||||||
MARINER FINANCE, LLC vs JEROME C. CHAMBERS, SR. | |||||||||
17CVG00434 | KANDI M. DOWELL, ET AL. | 4/4/2017 | |||||||
GREATER DAYTON PREMIER MANAGEMEN vs KANDI M. DOWELL, ET AL. | |||||||||
17CVG00435 | MARY A. BELL | 4/4/2017 | |||||||
GREATER DAYTON PREMIER MANAGEMEN vs MARY A. BELL | |||||||||
17CVG00441 | ALEX DALTON, ET. AL | 4/4/2017 | |||||||
GLENN HIATT vs ALEX DALTON, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVG00442 | SAMANTHA TACKETT, ET. AL | 4/4/2017 | |||||||
CMC PROPERTIES vs SAMANTHA TACKETT, ET. AL | |||||||||
17CVG00443 | ARCHIE PASS, ET AL | 4/4/2017 | |||||||
AUSTIN SPRINGS HOLDINGS, LLC DBA AUSTIN SPRINGS APARTMENTS vs ARCHIE PASS, ET AL | |||||||||
17CVG00444 | TIMOTHY DAVIS, ET. AL | 4/4/2017 | |||||||
HUNTERS CHASE DAYTON LLC DBA HUNTERS CHASE APARTMENTS vs TIMOTHY DAVIS, ET. AL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 577, 578, 579 ... 612, 613, 614 Next |