22900 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
12CVF03504 | LINDSEY A BOYD | 12/21/2012 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. SUCCESSOR TO CITIBANK (SOUTH DAK vs LINDSEY A BOYD | |||||||||
12CVG03499 | JOHNNY PACK | 12/21/2012 | |||||||
JANET L WOOD vs JOHNNY PACK | |||||||||
12CVI03502 | WILLIAM ROBERTS | 12/21/2012 | |||||||
WILLIAM RUDY vs WILLIAM ROBERTS | |||||||||
12CVF03503 | JEFFREY T RENSHAW | 12/21/2012 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. SUCCESSOR TO CITIBANK (SOUTH DAK vs JEFFREY T RENSHAW | |||||||||
12CVF03494 | KATHY ROYER | 12/20/2012 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK vs KATHY ROYER | |||||||||
12CVF03496 | JULIE A DUHL | 12/20/2012 | |||||||
EVEREST ACQUISITION LLC C/O SLOVIN & ASSOC. CO. LPA vs JULIE A DUHL | |||||||||
12CVF03497 | JOHNETTA SCIAPHINA GAITAWE | 12/20/2012 | |||||||
GREATER DAYTON SURGERY CENTER vs JOHNETTA SCIAPHINA GAITAWE | |||||||||
12CVG03495 | STEVE UPCHURCH | 12/20/2012 | |||||||
HELEN GAREY vs STEVE UPCHURCH | |||||||||
12CVI03493 | ANTHONY B WINGATE | 12/19/2012 | |||||||
DAVID E HAAN vs ANTHONY B WINGATE | |||||||||
12CVV00214 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | 12/19/2012 | |||||||
BRENT BLAINE vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
12CVF03490 | PHILIP WELLS | 12/18/2012 | |||||||
KETTERING HEALTH NETWORK CREDIT UNION vs PHILIP WELLS | |||||||||
12CVF03492 | SEAN LEIS | 12/18/2012 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN CO. OF OHIO vs SEAN LEIS | |||||||||
12CVF03491 | AMANDA LOVELL | 12/18/2012 | |||||||
KETTERING HEALTH NETWORK CREDIT UNION vs AMANDA LOVELL | |||||||||
12CVF03484 | DALE RIEDER | 12/17/2012 | |||||||
P & R COMMUNICATIONS SERVICE, INC vs DALE RIEDER | |||||||||
12CVF03485 | ROBERT NUGENT | 12/17/2012 | |||||||
VION HOLDINGS LLC vs ROBERT NUGENT | |||||||||
12CVF03488 | HEATHER A BIGNESS | 12/17/2012 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA vs HEATHER A BIGNESS | |||||||||
12CVG03486 | JESSICA WALLIS | 12/17/2012 | |||||||
KETWOOD APARTMENTS LTD vs JESSICA WALLIS | |||||||||
12CVG03487 | JUNE CONNOLLY | 12/17/2012 | |||||||
KETWOOD APARTMENTS LTD vs JUNE CONNOLLY | |||||||||
12CVG03489 | ZACHARY FULLER | 12/17/2012 | |||||||
KETWOOD APARTMENTS LTD vs ZACHARY FULLER | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1141, 1142, 1143, 1144, 1145 Next |