22900 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
13CVI00013 | NANCY PENN | 1/3/2013 | |||||||
GREENSCAPE HORTICULTURAL vs NANCY PENN | |||||||||
13CVF00001 | ERIC SPRANCE | 1/2/2013 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs ERIC SPRANCE | |||||||||
13CVF00002 | ERIC BURNS | 1/2/2013 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCITES, LL vs ERIC BURNS | |||||||||
13CVF00003 | SUSAN EMMONS | 1/2/2013 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs SUSAN EMMONS | |||||||||
13CVF00004 | MICHAEL T WILLS | 1/2/2013 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs MICHAEL T WILLS | |||||||||
13CVV00001 | OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | 1/2/2013 | |||||||
BRIAN KERNS vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | |||||||||
12CVG03515 | CHERYL KAHN | 12/28/2012 | |||||||
J A SENSABAUGH vs CHERYL KAHN | |||||||||
12CVG03512 | NATURAL BEAUTY | 12/28/2012 | |||||||
REVERE VILLAGE APARTMENTS vs NATURAL BEAUTY | |||||||||
12CVF03514 | CAMERON FLOYD | 12/28/2012 | |||||||
ADAM M OPAVA vs CAMERON FLOYD | |||||||||
12CVF03513 | JASON BLAKE | 12/28/2012 | |||||||
GREATER DAYTON SURGERY CENTER vs JASON BLAKE | |||||||||
12CVF03511 | JONATHAN MATTHEWS | 12/28/2012 | |||||||
CF NETWORK ISSUANCE TRUST 2010-1 vs JONATHAN MATTHEWS | |||||||||
12CVF03507 | SCOTT A WEST | 12/27/2012 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING D vs SCOTT A WEST | |||||||||
12CVF03508 | DONALD PARRISH | 12/27/2012 | |||||||
MAIN STREET ACQUISITION CORP vs DONALD PARRISH | |||||||||
12CVF03509 | ERIC F WESTLEY | 12/27/2012 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA vs ERIC F WESTLEY | |||||||||
12CVF03510 | SHAWNDELL SIPES | 12/27/2012 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING D vs SHAWNDELL SIPES | |||||||||
12CVG03505 | AMBER CAMPBELL | 12/27/2012 | |||||||
DOVETREE APARTMENTS vs AMBER CAMPBELL | |||||||||
12CVG03506 | SHEENA JOHNSON | 12/27/2012 | |||||||
DOVETREE APARTMENTS vs SHEENA JOHNSON | |||||||||
12CVF03498 | DANIEL G HALE | 12/21/2012 | |||||||
KENNETH D CHRISTMAN MD vs DANIEL G HALE | |||||||||
12CVF03500 | SHAUNA A BOLES | 12/21/2012 | |||||||
NCEP, LLC vs SHAUNA A BOLES | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1140, 1141, 1142, 1143, 1144, 1145 Next |