22900 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
13CVI00567 | CAROL JEAN RISH | 7/17/2013 | |||||||
RAYMOND GUDORF vs CAROL JEAN RISH | |||||||||
13CVI00569 | MARK VUKOVIC | 7/17/2013 | |||||||
DONALD HALL vs MARK VUKOVIC | |||||||||
13CVF00568 | STEPHANIE H BROWNING | 7/17/2013 | |||||||
DELL FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC vs STEPHANIE H BROWNING | |||||||||
13CVG00566 | SARA MCCALLISTER | 7/16/2013 | |||||||
WILLIAM D POTTER vs SARA MCCALLISTER | |||||||||
13CVF00563 | ANGELA JOHNSON | 7/15/2013 | |||||||
THE CONNOR GROUP vs ANGELA JOHNSON | |||||||||
13CVF00564 | CHAD M REESE | 7/15/2013 | |||||||
THE CONNOR GROUP DBA GEORGETOWN OF KETTERING vs CHAD M REESE | |||||||||
13CVF00565 | BETTINA D POTTS | 7/15/2013 | |||||||
FOUNTAIN SKIN CARE vs BETTINA D POTTS | |||||||||
13CVV00136 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | 7/15/2013 | |||||||
TOM D BERRY vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
13CVV00137 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | 7/15/2013 | |||||||
AMY LARSON vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
13CVF00557 | TERRI SPEAKS | 7/12/2013 | |||||||
ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC vs TERRI SPEAKS | |||||||||
13CVV00135 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | 7/12/2013 | |||||||
RICK L LYONS vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
13CVG00562 | FORREST HULL | 7/12/2013 | |||||||
DUANE EBY vs FORREST HULL | |||||||||
13CVF00561 | CHANTAL MARSHALL | 7/12/2013 | |||||||
BILLY HARRIS vs CHANTAL MARSHALL | |||||||||
13CVF00560 | DAVID WEYMOUTH | 7/12/2013 | |||||||
ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC vs DAVID WEYMOUTH | |||||||||
13CVF00559 | WILLIAM J ERBY | 7/12/2013 | |||||||
ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC vs WILLIAM J ERBY | |||||||||
13CVF00558 | ANDREA L SINGH | 7/12/2013 | |||||||
ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC vs ANDREA L SINGH | |||||||||
13CVF00556 | NANCY M FILO | 7/12/2013 | |||||||
ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC vs NANCY M FILO | |||||||||
13CVG00555 | CAROL PENQUITE | 7/11/2013 | |||||||
GREENMONT MUTUAL HOUSING CORP vs CAROL PENQUITE | |||||||||
13CVF00548 | KRISTY L WILSON | 7/10/2013 | |||||||
CBCS vs KRISTY L WILSON | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1101, 1102, 1103 ... 1143, 1144, 1145 Next |