22900 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
13CVG00584 | ADAM HUDSON | 7/24/2013 | |||||||
CORNERSTONE GOVERNOURS SQUARE LTD vs ADAM HUDSON | |||||||||
13CVG00585 | ERIN WHITE | 7/24/2013 | |||||||
DEARWESTERS GEM CITY ESTATES INC vs ERIN WHITE | |||||||||
13CVI00582 | AMS UNIFORMS | 7/24/2013 | |||||||
CROSS POINTE ASSOCIATES, LLC vs AMS UNIFORMS | |||||||||
13CVV00140 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR | 7/24/2013 | |||||||
GEORGE KUNTZ vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR | |||||||||
13CVF00583 | BECKY RECTOR | 7/24/2013 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs BECKY RECTOR | |||||||||
13CVG00580 | JOSHUA BBANDA | 7/23/2013 | |||||||
DOVETREE APARTMENTS vs JOSHUA BBANDA | |||||||||
13CVG00581 | ANNA BRADLEY | 7/23/2013 | |||||||
REVERE VILLAGE APARTMENT vs ANNA BRADLEY | |||||||||
13CVI00578 | STEPHEN WIESEMANN | 7/23/2013 | |||||||
DOUGLAS OEN vs STEPHEN WIESEMANN | |||||||||
13CVI00579 | MICHELLE CALDWELL | 7/23/2013 | |||||||
BAUER ROOFING , SIDING & SOLAR SOLUTIONS LLC vs MICHELLE CALDWELL | |||||||||
13CVE00575 | BRIDGET MILLER | 7/22/2013 | |||||||
SHELTER INSURANCE COMPANY vs BRIDGET MILLER | |||||||||
13CVF00577 | STEVEN SAYLOR | 7/22/2013 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING D vs STEVEN SAYLOR | |||||||||
13CVF00576 | DENNIS CABLE | 7/22/2013 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING D vs DENNIS CABLE | |||||||||
13CVF00571 | NORBERT L KAHLE | 7/19/2013 | |||||||
CACH, LLC vs NORBERT L KAHLE | |||||||||
13CVF00572 | ROBERT E WALLS | 7/19/2013 | |||||||
WRIGHT STATE UNIVERSITY C/O STATE OF OHIO COLLECTIONS EN vs ROBERT E WALLS | |||||||||
13CVF00573 | LEONELF MANCINAS | 7/19/2013 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING D vs LEONELF MANCINAS | |||||||||
13CVG00570 | REBEKAH PETITT | 7/19/2013 | |||||||
JONATHAN E GAUDER vs REBEKAH PETITT | |||||||||
13CVI00574 | FIVE STAR COMMERCIAL ROOFING | 7/19/2013 | |||||||
GEORGE F STANLEY Jr. vs FIVE STAR COMMERCIAL ROOFING | |||||||||
13CVV00138 | BUREAU OF MOTOR | 7/18/2013 | |||||||
JASON E MANDRY vs BUREAU OF MOTOR | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1100, 1101, 1102 ... 1143, 1144, 1145 Next |