22942 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
13CVI00631 | MEREDITH DEPPEN | 8/12/2013 | |||||||
DAYTON LANDSCAPING vs MEREDITH DEPPEN | |||||||||
13CVF00629 | JOSHUA L WHETSTONE | 8/9/2013 | |||||||
DON WRIGHT REALTY, LLC vs JOSHUA L WHETSTONE | |||||||||
13CVI00628 | LIBERTY OPPORTUNITIES, INC | 8/9/2013 | |||||||
CHRISTOPHER BOCKO vs LIBERTY OPPORTUNITIES, INC | |||||||||
13CVI00630 | DAVID MCGUIRE DR | 8/9/2013 | |||||||
MARVIN D HOPKINS vs DAVID MCGUIRE Dr | |||||||||
13CVV00155 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, BMV | 8/9/2013 | |||||||
SETH YATES vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, BMV | |||||||||
13CVF00626 | JULIAN S PEASANT | 8/8/2013 | |||||||
ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC vs JULIAN S PEASANT | |||||||||
13CVI00627 | ROBERT WISE | 8/8/2013 | |||||||
MICHELLE COBB vs ROBERT WISE | |||||||||
13CVV00153 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, BMV | 8/8/2013 | |||||||
KENDRA WRIGHT vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, BMV | |||||||||
13CVV00154 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | 8/8/2013 | |||||||
KENNETH E POULTER II vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
13CVV00150 | OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | 8/7/2013 | |||||||
KEVIN E GOODRICH vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | |||||||||
13CVV00152 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | 8/7/2013 | |||||||
JOHN R HOFFMAN vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
13CVV00151 | OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | 8/7/2013 | |||||||
THOMAS A DAY vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | |||||||||
13CVF00625 | SHALAY DIEHL | 8/7/2013 | |||||||
SUNDANCE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT vs SHALAY DIEHL | |||||||||
13CVF00623 | DARRYL EDWARDS | 8/6/2013 | |||||||
CACH, LLC vs DARRYL EDWARDS | |||||||||
13CVF00624 | GREGORY J BRUGGEMAN | 8/6/2013 | |||||||
CACH, LLC vs GREGORY J BRUGGEMAN | |||||||||
13CVG00622 | DOUGLAS MASSIE | 8/6/2013 | |||||||
MARK CASTIGLIONE vs DOUGLAS MASSIE | |||||||||
13CVE00614 | DEMETRIUS M SABIN | 8/5/2013 | |||||||
AMERICAN FAMILY INS CO vs DEMETRIUS M SABIN | |||||||||
13CVF00613 | LORE TUSSEY | 8/5/2013 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs LORE TUSSEY | |||||||||
13CVF00615 | ROBERT SALYERS | 8/5/2013 | |||||||
CREDIT INVESTMENTS, INC vs ROBERT SALYERS | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1099, 1100, 1101 ... 1146, 1147, 1148 Next |