22942 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
13CVI00645 | GREENMONT VILLAGE | 8/16/2013 | |||||||
RUSSELL BOHANNON vs GREENMONT VILLAGE | |||||||||
13CVI00646 | DEATON BRIAN | 8/16/2013 | |||||||
ETHEL HOLBROOK vs DEATON BRIAN | |||||||||
13CVV00156 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | 8/16/2013 | |||||||
LORI A CROUCH vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
13CVV00157 | OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | 8/16/2013 | |||||||
JENNIFER GLASGOW vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | |||||||||
13CVV00158 | OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | 8/16/2013 | |||||||
MICHAEL J O'GARA vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | |||||||||
13CVV00159 | OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | 8/16/2013 | |||||||
TYLER W CHAMBERLAIN vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | |||||||||
13CVG00649 | BRANDY CARPER | 8/16/2013 | |||||||
LSRK MANAGEMENT vs BRANDY CARPER | |||||||||
13CVG00641 | STEPHEN MORRIS MOSBAUGH | 8/15/2013 | |||||||
CASTLE ROCK REO vs STEPHEN MORRIS MOSBAUGH | |||||||||
13CVF00644 | NICK PENWELL | 8/15/2013 | |||||||
ENGINEERING ASSOCIATES vs NICK PENWELL | |||||||||
13CVF00643 | VIRGINIA D GERKIN | 8/15/2013 | |||||||
CYPRESS FINANCIAL vs VIRGINIA D GERKIN | |||||||||
13CVF00642 | VIRGINIA GERKIN | 8/15/2013 | |||||||
FFIF - ACM OPPORTUNITY FUND, LLC ASSIGNEE OF US BANK vs VIRGINIA GERKIN | |||||||||
13CVI00640 | THOMAS WILLIAMS | 8/14/2013 | |||||||
VOSS CHEVROLET, INC vs THOMAS WILLIAMS | |||||||||
13CVF00638 | TIM J LAMB | 8/13/2013 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs TIM J LAMB | |||||||||
13CVI00639 | EGREEN LLC SONNY ARWOOD | 8/13/2013 | |||||||
ASAP vs EGREEN LLC SONNY ARWOOD | |||||||||
13CVF00632 | JEFF FRALEY | 8/12/2013 | |||||||
FOUNTAIN SKIN CARE vs JEFF FRALEY | |||||||||
13CVF00633 | SHARON MCKIBBEN | 8/12/2013 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs SHARON MCKIBBEN | |||||||||
13CVF00634 | SAMUEL JONES | 8/12/2013 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs SAMUEL JONES | |||||||||
13CVF00635 | ROBERT BOWLES | 8/12/2013 | |||||||
SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES OF OHIO, INC vs ROBERT BOWLES | |||||||||
13CVF00636 | RICHARD A VAUGHAN | 8/12/2013 | |||||||
CBCS vs RICHARD A VAUGHAN | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1098, 1099, 1100 ... 1146, 1147, 1148 Next |