22942 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
13CVV00171 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, BMV | 8/27/2013 | |||||||
BRAIN WHITT vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, BMV | |||||||||
13CVF00674 | ALEXIA FORD | 8/26/2013 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC vs ALEXIA FORD | |||||||||
13CVF00675 | CHIMNEYS OF OAK CREEK, LLC NATIONAL REG AGENTS, I... | 8/26/2013 | |||||||
COLLINS CARPET CARE, LLC vs CHIMNEYS OF OAK CREEK, LLC NATIONAL REG AGENTS, I... | |||||||||
13CVF00676 | NANCY K RADER | 8/26/2013 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L HSBC CONSUMER LENDING vs NANCY K RADER | |||||||||
13CVV00168 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | 8/26/2013 | |||||||
RYDAL ARNOLD vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
13CVV00169 | OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | 8/26/2013 | |||||||
RACHEL HARNEY vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | |||||||||
13CVG00673 | RONALD H HUTCHISON | 8/23/2013 | |||||||
DBH ENTERPRISES INC vs RONALD H HUTCHISON | |||||||||
13CVI00672 | MIKE SEVERS | 8/23/2013 | |||||||
DANIEL LEWIS GRAETER vs MIKE SEVERS | |||||||||
13CVV00166 | OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | 8/23/2013 | |||||||
DALLAS MANKER vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | |||||||||
13CVV00167 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES | 8/23/2013 | |||||||
DOUGLAS E EVANS vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES | |||||||||
13CVF00667 | WILLIAM J HECHLER | 8/22/2013 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA vs WILLIAM J HECHLER | |||||||||
13CVV00165 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES VIOLATIONS SECTION | 8/22/2013 | |||||||
MARCUS YEAZEL vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES VIOLATIONS SECTION | |||||||||
13CVV00164 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR | 8/22/2013 | |||||||
DAVID B REYNOLDS vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR | |||||||||
13CVI00668 | BILL LAMBERT | 8/22/2013 | |||||||
CORY MOELLER vs BILL LAMBERT | |||||||||
13CVG00669 | KIMBERLY COLLINSWORTH-LIBECAP | 8/22/2013 | |||||||
DAVID GREENE vs KIMBERLY COLLINSWORTH-LIBECAP | |||||||||
13CVF00671 | BETH ADDIS | 8/22/2013 | |||||||
LIBERTY RETIREMENT COMMUNITY OF WASHINGTON TOWNSHIP INC vs BETH ADDIS | |||||||||
13CVF00670 | BARRY THOMPSON | 8/22/2013 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING D vs BARRY THOMPSON | |||||||||
13CVF00660 | TAYLOR JONES | 8/21/2013 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs TAYLOR JONES | |||||||||
13CVF00661 | DARLYENE ANSTAETT | 8/21/2013 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. SUCCESSOR TO CITIBANK (SOUTH DAK vs DARLYENE ANSTAETT | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1096, 1097, 1098 ... 1146, 1147, 1148 Next |