22942 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
13CVI00710 | STANLEY RADFORD | 9/6/2013 | |||||||
GRANT S DONALDSON vs STANLEY RADFORD | |||||||||
13CVG00709 | CRAIG MUSTARD | 9/6/2013 | |||||||
JAMES HORWATH vs CRAIG MUSTARD | |||||||||
13CVF00708 | LAUREN WHITMAN | 9/5/2013 | |||||||
STERLING JEWELERS INC vs LAUREN WHITMAN | |||||||||
13CVF00705 | DIANE C BRAYTON | 9/4/2013 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA). N.A. vs DIANE C BRAYTON | |||||||||
13CVF00706 | TRICIA COONEY | 9/4/2013 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L ASSIGNEE OF GE CAPITAL RETAIL BA vs TRICIA COONEY | |||||||||
13CVF00707 | MILANI BRION | 9/4/2013 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L ASSIGNEE OF GE CAPITAL RETAIL BA vs MILANI BRION | |||||||||
13CVF00703 | CORRIE M HANKS | 9/3/2013 | |||||||
CREDIT INVESTMENTS INC vs CORRIE M HANKS | |||||||||
13CVV00176 | OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | 9/3/2013 | |||||||
JOHN F BANKE vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | |||||||||
13CVV00175 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR-STATE OF OHIO | 9/3/2013 | |||||||
CHRISTOPHER A BUCHER vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR-STATE OF OHIO | |||||||||
13CVV00174 | OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | 9/3/2013 | |||||||
BRITTANY R JOHNSON vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | |||||||||
13CVF00704 | SEKOU GRANTHAM | 9/3/2013 | |||||||
CREDIT INVESTMENTS INC vs SEKOU GRANTHAM | |||||||||
13CVF00702 | NATALIE TAYLOR | 9/3/2013 | |||||||
CREDIT INVESTMENTS INC vs NATALIE TAYLOR | |||||||||
13CVF00701 | AMADO A MARTINEZ | 9/3/2013 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS vs AMADO A MARTINEZ | |||||||||
13CVF00700 | JENNIFER PENEWIT | 9/3/2013 | |||||||
CACH, LLC vs JENNIFER PENEWIT | |||||||||
13CVF00699 | ANGELEAH R SMITH | 9/3/2013 | |||||||
WRIGHT-PATT CREDIT UNION, INC vs ANGELEAH R SMITH | |||||||||
13CVE00693 | RICHARD WESTENDORF | 8/30/2013 | |||||||
GUIDEONE MUTUAL INS. CO. AOS MORAINE CITY BAPTIST CHURCH vs RICHARD WESTENDORF | |||||||||
13CVF00694 | SAM CAMPBELL JR. | 8/30/2013 | |||||||
CYPRESS FINANCIAL vs SAM CAMPBELL Jr. | |||||||||
13CVF00695 | JERRY J LINDSEY | 8/30/2013 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC SUCCESSOR TO TRIBUTE CARD vs JERRY J LINDSEY | |||||||||
13CVG00697 | MARK DELEO | 8/30/2013 | |||||||
NORA MONNIN vs MARK DELEO | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1094, 1095, 1096 ... 1146, 1147, 1148 Next |