22942 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
13CVF00729 | DAVID HINLEY | 9/16/2013 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs DAVID HINLEY | |||||||||
13CVE00726 | JESSICA M COOPER | 9/13/2013 | |||||||
AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY SUBROGEE OF ALLYN W. CONWAY, II vs JESSICA M COOPER | |||||||||
13CVF00724 | EXIE L JOHNSON | 9/12/2013 | |||||||
SINCLAIR COMMUNITY COLLEGE vs EXIE L JOHNSON | |||||||||
13CVG00723 | MATTHEW HINKLE | 9/12/2013 | |||||||
JIAQUANG MA vs MATTHEW HINKLE | |||||||||
13CVG00725 | DAWN K WOODALL | 9/12/2013 | |||||||
WEXFORD MANAGEMENT, CO vs DAWN K WOODALL | |||||||||
13CVV00179 | OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | 9/12/2013 | |||||||
JONATHON YOUNG vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | |||||||||
13CVF00721 | SOUTHLAND FLOORING | 9/11/2013 | |||||||
GREATER DAYTON SURGERY CENTER vs SOUTHLAND FLOORING | |||||||||
13CVF00722 | TAMARA A HERLIHY | 9/11/2013 | |||||||
FRIENDLY FINANCE CORPORATION vs TAMARA A HERLIHY | |||||||||
13CVI00720 | MATTIE GANTT | 9/11/2013 | |||||||
CAROL HALEY vs MATTIE GANTT | |||||||||
13CVI00718 | JOYCE BRANDEWIE | 9/10/2013 | |||||||
DEBRA HUTCHINS vs JOYCE BRANDEWIE | |||||||||
13CVG00719 | CACEY JO WALDEN | 9/10/2013 | |||||||
BRUNILDA VELEZ vs CACEY JO WALDEN | |||||||||
13CVF00712 | BARNEY GRAHAM III | 9/9/2013 | |||||||
CYPRESS FINANCIAL vs BARNEY GRAHAM III | |||||||||
13CVF00713 | YVETTE R HABER | 9/9/2013 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs YVETTE R HABER | |||||||||
13CVF00714 | MICHAEL S THOMPSON | 9/9/2013 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L ASSIGNEE OF FIA CARD SERVICES vs MICHAEL S THOMPSON | |||||||||
13CVF00717 | BRYAN PATERCHAK | 9/9/2013 | |||||||
CACH, LLC vs BRYAN PATERCHAK | |||||||||
13CVG00716 | WILLIAM L RICHARDSON | 9/9/2013 | |||||||
FYFFE FAMILY TRUST vs WILLIAM L RICHARDSON | |||||||||
13CVI00711 | BRYAN CHAMBERS | 9/9/2013 | |||||||
NICOLE FLANARY vs BRYAN CHAMBERS | |||||||||
13CVI00715 | FIRST, WOOD, AND FLOWERS | 9/9/2013 | |||||||
MICHAEL WENZLER vs FIRST, WOOD, AND FLOWERS | |||||||||
13CVV00177 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | 9/9/2013 | |||||||
MATTHEW W.R. SLUSHER vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1093, 1094, 1095 ... 1146, 1147, 1148 Next |