21583 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
13CVV00008 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | 1/24/2013 | |||||||
CHELSEA MCGEE vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
13CVV00009 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | 1/24/2013 | |||||||
DAVID M PENNEY vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
13CVV00010 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | 1/24/2013 | |||||||
PATRICIA A SMITH vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
13CVV00007 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | 1/24/2013 | |||||||
JOHN SCHRAND vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
13CVF00054 | MATTHEW MCKENNA | 1/22/2013 | |||||||
KETTERING ANESTHESIA ASSOC INC vs MATTHEW MCKENNA | |||||||||
13CVG00053 | CLARA HENDRIX | 1/22/2013 | |||||||
EDWARD JONES vs CLARA HENDRIX | |||||||||
13CVG00055 | MICHELLE HAWK | 1/22/2013 | |||||||
CARL HALL vs MICHELLE HAWK | |||||||||
13CVG00051 | DARCY L SHEPHERD | 1/18/2013 | |||||||
CLASSIC HOME REMODELING LLC vs DARCY L SHEPHERD | |||||||||
13CVF00052 | DARRELL (DJ) COLLINS | 1/18/2013 | |||||||
DON WRIGHT REALTY, LLC vs DARRELL (DJ) COLLINS | |||||||||
13CVF00050 | WESLEY GIBSON | 1/18/2013 | |||||||
SUNDANCE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT vs WESLEY GIBSON | |||||||||
13CVF00049 | CHARLES HAYNES | 1/18/2013 | |||||||
SUNDANCE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT vs CHARLES HAYNES | |||||||||
13CVE00047 | CHELSIA ELAINE TEEGARDEN | 1/17/2013 | |||||||
AMERICAN FAMILY INSURANCE CO. vs CHELSIA ELAINE TEEGARDEN | |||||||||
13CVF00046 | STEVEN CONSTANTINE | 1/17/2013 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK vs STEVEN CONSTANTINE | |||||||||
13CVF00048 | JAMES E DEBORD | 1/17/2013 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK vs JAMES E DEBORD | |||||||||
13CVF00042 | DORIS ROBERTS | 1/16/2013 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs DORIS ROBERTS | |||||||||
13CVF00043 | BRADLEY GABBARD | 1/16/2013 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs BRADLEY GABBARD | |||||||||
13CVF00044 | STEFAN MAURY | 1/16/2013 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs STEFAN MAURY | |||||||||
13CVF00045 | STEVEN SASSAMAN | 1/16/2013 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs STEVEN SASSAMAN | |||||||||
13CVG00041 | BRAD MCFARLAND | 1/16/2013 | |||||||
JUDY HEIKES vs BRAD MCFARLAND | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1063, 1064, 1065 ... 1078, 1079, 1080 Next |