21583 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
13CVI00217 | RICHARD A. WALLIS | 3/8/2013 | |||||||
LAWRENCE JAFFE vs RICHARD A. WALLIS | |||||||||
13CVI00218 | CHARLIE COLE DEVAULT | 3/8/2013 | |||||||
RYAN OSTERDAY vs CHARLIE COLE DEVAULT | |||||||||
13CVI00219 | CHARLIE COLE DEVAULT | 3/8/2013 | |||||||
RYAN OSTERDAY vs CHARLIE COLE DEVAULT | |||||||||
13CVV00031 | OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR | 3/8/2013 | |||||||
COLIN FOSTER vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR | |||||||||
13CVI00213 | LANCE CLOUD | 3/8/2013 | |||||||
KIEN K TRUONG vs LANCE CLOUD | |||||||||
13CVF00210 | TAMMY T SPARKS | 3/7/2013 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC BUYER OF HSBC BANK NEVADA vs TAMMY T SPARKS | |||||||||
13CVF00209 | PAMELA KEENE | 3/7/2013 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs PAMELA KEENE | |||||||||
13CVF00208 | JEFF L DEMMINGS | 3/7/2013 | |||||||
STATE OF OHIO - CLARK STATE COMMUNITY COLLEGE vs JEFF L DEMMINGS | |||||||||
13CVF00207 | AMY DEAN | 3/7/2013 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs AMY DEAN | |||||||||
13CVF00206 | WALTER JOHNSON | 3/7/2013 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs WALTER JOHNSON | |||||||||
13CVF00205 | DAVE TURTON | 3/7/2013 | |||||||
CLEAR CHOICE HOME IMPROVEMENTS LLC vs DAVE TURTON | |||||||||
13CVI00203 | KEISHA R CRAVER | 3/6/2013 | |||||||
JEFFERY T CARTER vs KEISHA R CRAVER | |||||||||
13CVI00204 | JIMMY R VAUGHN | 3/6/2013 | |||||||
JEFFERY T CARTER vs JIMMY R VAUGHN | |||||||||
13CVF00200 | JOHN KEREKESH | 3/5/2013 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA vs JOHN KEREKESH | |||||||||
13CVF00201 | NICHOLAS B MADEWELL | 3/5/2013 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs NICHOLAS B MADEWELL | |||||||||
13CVF00202 | TERRANCE HEDRICK | 3/5/2013 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA vs TERRANCE HEDRICK | |||||||||
13CVE00197 | ANTWAN M WILLIS | 3/4/2013 | |||||||
NATIONWIDE MUTUAL FIRE INSUR. CO vs ANTWAN M WILLIS | |||||||||
13CVF00192 | JAMES NARTKER | 3/4/2013 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L ASSIGNEE OF GE CAPITAL RETAIL BA vs JAMES NARTKER | |||||||||
13CVF00193 | KELSEY SUTTON | 3/4/2013 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs KELSEY SUTTON | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1054, 1055, 1056 ... 1078, 1079, 1080 Next |