21583 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
13CVV00037 | OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | 3/14/2013 | |||||||
ELIZABETH EVERETT vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | |||||||||
13CVE00228 | DAIVD V MATHENY | 3/13/2013 | |||||||
ALLSTATE PROPERTY & CASUALTY IN vs DAIVD V MATHENY | |||||||||
13CVI00229 | DONNA WRAY | 3/13/2013 | |||||||
SELLERS LAWN CARE INC vs DONNA WRAY | |||||||||
13CVV00035 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | 3/13/2013 | |||||||
MICHAEL ORMOND vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
13CVV00034 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | 3/12/2013 | |||||||
RYAN P WOODIE vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
13CVF00226 | MATTHEW L MITCHELL | 3/11/2013 | |||||||
ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC vs MATTHEW L MITCHELL | |||||||||
13CVV00033 | OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | 3/11/2013 | |||||||
CHESTER THOMPSON vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | |||||||||
13CVV00032 | OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | 3/11/2013 | |||||||
CODY M CAMPBELL vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | |||||||||
13CVG00225 | LEAH C JAMES | 3/11/2013 | |||||||
CHEVY CHASE PARK APARTMENTS vs LEAH C JAMES | |||||||||
13CVF00227 | CHARLES L WILSON | 3/11/2013 | |||||||
ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC vs CHARLES L WILSON | |||||||||
13CVF00224 | DONALD W MAUDLIN | 3/11/2013 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs DONALD W MAUDLIN | |||||||||
13CVF00223 | JENNIFER A PITNER | 3/11/2013 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L ASSIGNEE OF GE CAPITAL RETAIL BA vs JENNIFER A PITNE... | |||||||||
13CVF00222 | KAYCEE KLEEHAMER | 3/11/2013 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL, INC vs KAYCEE KLEEHAMER | |||||||||
13CVF00221 | MOLLY STEVENSON | 3/11/2013 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES ASSET MGMT DBA REVERE VILLAGE vs MOLLY STEVENSON | |||||||||
13CVF00220 | JEFFERY FISHER | 3/11/2013 | |||||||
SECURITY CREDIT SERVICES vs JEFFERY FISHER | |||||||||
13CVF00211 | ROBERT PINA | 3/8/2013 | |||||||
LOVOYD WOODRUFF vs ROBERT PINA | |||||||||
13CVF00212 | MICHAEL ABNEY | 3/8/2013 | |||||||
SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES OF OHIO, INC vs MICHAEL ABNEY | |||||||||
13CVF00215 | STEPHANIE H BROWNING | 3/8/2013 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. SUCCESSOR TO CITIBANK (SOUTH DAK vs STEPHANIE H BROWNING | |||||||||
13CVF00216 | DONNA R GORDON | 3/8/2013 | |||||||
TARGET NATIONAL BANK vs DONNA R GORDON | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1053, 1054, 1055 ... 1078, 1079, 1080 Next |