21583 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
13CVV00043 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | 3/21/2013 | |||||||
PATRICK MCCREARY vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
13CVF00244 | NEVIN SMITH | 3/20/2013 | |||||||
CAPERNA FAMILY LIMITED PARTNER SHIP vs NEVIN SMITH | |||||||||
13CVF00245 | PAUL LUTE | 3/20/2013 | |||||||
CAPERNA FAMILY LIMITED PARTNER SHIP vs PAUL LUTE | |||||||||
13CVG00240 | JAMES PLEASON | 3/20/2013 | |||||||
J.L ZIMMERMAN REALTY AGENT FOR OWNER VIRGIL BROWN vs JAMES PLEASON | |||||||||
13CVG00242 | MELANIE BARNES | 3/20/2013 | |||||||
FRED DEATON vs MELANIE BARNES | |||||||||
13CVG00246 | SCOTT SORTMAN | 3/20/2013 | |||||||
JIYOUNG HUR vs SCOTT SORTMAN | |||||||||
13CVI00239 | RYAN BEAM | 3/20/2013 | |||||||
BENJAMIN M JONES vs RYAN BEAM | |||||||||
13CVI00241 | MARIE CASELLA | 3/20/2013 | |||||||
OAKWOOD LAWN & LANDSCAPING CO IN vs MARIE CASELLA | |||||||||
13CVG00238 | AMANDA STIDHAM | 3/19/2013 | |||||||
SUE HULTON vs AMANDA STIDHAM | |||||||||
13CVV00039 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR-STATE OF OHIO | 3/19/2013 | |||||||
RALPH REIDELL III vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR-STATE OF OHIO | |||||||||
13CVF00236 | GARY ROHRBACK | 3/18/2013 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORP vs GARY ROHRBACK | |||||||||
13CVV00038 | OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES FRANKLIN CALTRIDER, ... | 3/18/2013 | |||||||
ADAM UNGER vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES FRANKLIN CALTRIDER, ... | |||||||||
13CVF00237 | RONNIE GEHRING | 3/18/2013 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING D vs RONNIE GEHRING | |||||||||
13CVF00234 | MATTHEW OLINGER | 3/15/2013 | |||||||
HEARTLAND FEDERAL CREDIT UNION vs MATTHEW OLINGER | |||||||||
13CVI00232 | CLEAN CAR INC | 3/15/2013 | |||||||
TINA WERTS vs CLEAN CAR INC | |||||||||
13CVI00233 | LISA CACCAMO | 3/15/2013 | |||||||
SHELLEY H WAGSHUL vs LISA CACCAMO | |||||||||
13CVI00235 | ANDREA WATTS | 3/15/2013 | |||||||
LARRY JAFFE vs ANDREA WATTS | |||||||||
13CVF00231 | STEVE TAYLOR | 3/14/2013 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING D vs STEVE TAYLOR | |||||||||
13CVI00230 | HEATHER MACQUARRIE | 3/14/2013 | |||||||
MICHAEL DIXON vs HEATHER MACQUARRIE | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1052, 1053, 1054 ... 1078, 1079, 1080 Next |