21583 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
13CVF00265 | ANDREA WAGNER | 3/27/2013 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC vs ANDREA WAGNER | |||||||||
13CVG00258 | CHRISTOPHER JONES | 3/27/2013 | |||||||
C F L PROPERTIES vs CHRISTOPHER JONES | |||||||||
13CVI00259 | REBECCA OVERMAN | 3/27/2013 | |||||||
LAMANNA'S LAWN & LANDSCAPING vs REBECCA OVERMAN | |||||||||
13CVV00046 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR-STATE OF OHIO | 3/27/2013 | |||||||
SARA M BOAZ vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR-STATE OF OHIO | |||||||||
13CVF00264 | PETER UMINA | 3/27/2013 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC vs PETER UMINA | |||||||||
13CVF00255 | PAMELA J DUNCAN | 3/26/2013 | |||||||
DON WRIGHT REALTY, LLC vs PAMELA J DUNCAN | |||||||||
13CVI00254 | CHRISTJOEL MOORE | 3/26/2013 | |||||||
TRAILS OF OAK CREEK vs CHRISTJOEL MOORE | |||||||||
13CVI00256 | SARA RONDTHALER | 3/26/2013 | |||||||
HEATHER A LAY vs SARA RONDTHALER | |||||||||
13CVF00252 | LATISHA TOGAN | 3/25/2013 | |||||||
TENDER LOVING CHILDCARE CENTER LLC vs LATISHA TOGAN | |||||||||
13CVV00045 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, BMV | 3/25/2013 | |||||||
JASON C WENNER vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, BMV | |||||||||
13CVG00249 | STEVEN TANKERSLEY JR. | 3/25/2013 | |||||||
DEARWESTER'S GEM CITY ESTATES INC vs STEVEN TANKERSLEY Jr. | |||||||||
13CVG00248 | ROBIN D. COOTS | 3/25/2013 | |||||||
DEARWESTER'S GEM CITY ESTATES INC vs ROBIN D. COOTS | |||||||||
13CVF00253 | BRANDON C GREINER | 3/25/2013 | |||||||
CORNERSTONE GOVERNOURS SQUARE LT DBA GOVERNOURS SQUARE vs BRANDON C GREINER | |||||||||
13CVF00251 | NAKAI BURNS | 3/25/2013 | |||||||
TENDER LOVING CHILDCARE CENTER LLC vs NAKAI BURNS | |||||||||
13CVF00250 | AMER MUSTAFA | 3/25/2013 | |||||||
MIAMI VALLEY HOSPITAL vs AMER MUSTAFA | |||||||||
13CVG00247 | HERLINDA LEIBOVITCH | 3/22/2013 | |||||||
TD PROPERTIES vs HERLINDA LEIBOVITCH | |||||||||
13CVV00044 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | 3/22/2013 | |||||||
DYLAN WANKE vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
13CVV00040 | OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | 3/21/2013 | |||||||
TROY MAGERS vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | |||||||||
13CVV00041 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | 3/21/2013 | |||||||
THOMAS A HARTING vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1051, 1052, 1053 ... 1078, 1079, 1080 Next |