21583 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
13CVF00291 | JAMES L JENKINS | 4/5/2013 | |||||||
ASSET ACCEPTANCE CORP LLC vs JAMES L JENKINS | |||||||||
13CVG00289 | DOMINIC PATRICK | 4/5/2013 | |||||||
NORMANDY CLUB APARTMENTS vs DOMINIC PATRICK | |||||||||
13CVV00055 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR-STATE OF OHIO | 4/5/2013 | |||||||
TODD W COOK vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR-STATE OF OHIO | |||||||||
13CVV00056 | OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | 4/5/2013 | |||||||
ELIZABETH A YINGER vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | |||||||||
13CVF00290 | TRAVIS M WOLESLAGLE | 4/5/2013 | |||||||
ASSET ACCEPTANCE CORP LLC vs TRAVIS M WOLESLAGLE | |||||||||
13CVV00053 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | 4/4/2013 | |||||||
WILLIAM S WOOLF vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
13CVV00054 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | 4/4/2013 | |||||||
CLYDE LIPKER vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
13CVI00285 | JAMES W BALLARD II | 4/4/2013 | |||||||
KINZELER REALTY vs JAMES W BALLARD II | |||||||||
13CVI00284 | MIKE DIXON | 4/4/2013 | |||||||
ALPHA RENTALS, LLC vs MIKE DIXON | |||||||||
13CVI00283 | HARRY SMITH | 4/4/2013 | |||||||
ALPHA RENTALS, LLC vs HARRY SMITH | |||||||||
13CVF00287 | ELIZABETH CROCKER | 4/4/2013 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs ELIZABETH CROCKER | |||||||||
13CVF00286 | POSITIVE ELECTRIC INC | 4/4/2013 | |||||||
MH EQUIPMENT COMPANY vs POSITIVE ELECTRIC INC | |||||||||
13CVI00282 | IAN LEACH | 4/3/2013 | |||||||
WILLIAM ARROWOOD vs IAN LEACH | |||||||||
13CVV00051 | OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | 4/3/2013 | |||||||
CRAIG A FLOHRE vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | |||||||||
13CVV00052 | OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | 4/3/2013 | |||||||
AMANDA TERRY vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | |||||||||
13CVF00280 | MARY L RIDSBY | 4/2/2013 | |||||||
LIBERTY RETIREMENT COMMUNITY OF WASHINGTON TWNSHP, INC vs MARY L RIDSBY | |||||||||
13CVF00281 | STEFAN WINTER | 4/2/2013 | |||||||
GOLLINGS ARENA DODGE vs STEFAN WINTER | |||||||||
13CVF00272 | MICHELLE BOTTS | 4/1/2013 | |||||||
CBCS vs MICHELLE BOTTS | |||||||||
13CVF00273 | ANITA ALLEN | 4/1/2013 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs ANITA ALLEN | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1049, 1050, 1051 ... 1078, 1079, 1080 Next |