21583 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
13CVG00318 | MARY SMITH CRAIG | 4/17/2013 | |||||||
RYFAMCO MATT STEVENS vs MARY SMITH CRAIG | |||||||||
13CVG00319 | BEVERLY LAMB | 4/17/2013 | |||||||
TIMOTHY A WAGSTROM vs BEVERLY LAMB | |||||||||
13CVV00065 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR | 4/17/2013 | |||||||
JOHN PALECEK vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR | |||||||||
13CVF00320 | JOHN ALLEN | 4/17/2013 | |||||||
BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE vs JOHN ALLEN | |||||||||
13CVV00063 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VECHICLES | 4/16/2013 | |||||||
MICHAEL J SANDERS vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VECHICLES | |||||||||
13CVV00064 | OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | 4/16/2013 | |||||||
MICHAEL C HOGAN vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTR... | |||||||||
13CVI00313 | WILLIAM C LAMBERT | 4/16/2013 | |||||||
CRAIG THOMPSON vs WILLIAM C LAMBERT | |||||||||
13CVG00314 | STEVE CENTERS | 4/16/2013 | |||||||
NORA BRENNER vs STEVE CENTERS | |||||||||
13CVG00312 | ROCHELLE TAFT | 4/16/2013 | |||||||
TERRACE HILLS HOUSING LTD PSHIP vs ROCHELLE TAFT | |||||||||
13CVF00317 | MICHAEL TRIMBLE | 4/16/2013 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs MICHAEL TRIMBLE | |||||||||
13CVF00316 | STEPHANIE S MCAVENE | 4/16/2013 | |||||||
RENAL PHYSICIANS, INC vs STEPHANIE S MCAVENE | |||||||||
13CVF00315 | EXITO MANUFACTURING LLC | 4/16/2013 | |||||||
THYSSEN KRUPP MATERIALS vs EXITO MANUFACTURING LLC | |||||||||
13CVV00062 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR | 4/15/2013 | |||||||
PEGGY L KIDD vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR | |||||||||
13CVF00309 | JOHN SMITH | 4/12/2013 | |||||||
BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE vs JOHN SMITH | |||||||||
13CVF00310 | JAFAR SHAQRA | 4/12/2013 | |||||||
THOMAS W WURST vs JAFAR SHAQRA | |||||||||
13CVF00311 | ARIZONA DAVIS | 4/12/2013 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs ARIZONA DAVIS | |||||||||
13CVG00308 | KIM BURKS | 4/12/2013 | |||||||
ELISE LARAVIE vs KIM BURKS | |||||||||
13CVF00305 | ERIC LEVENTHAL | 4/11/2013 | |||||||
CBCS vs ERIC LEVENTHAL | |||||||||
13CVF00306 | ASHLEY E SMITH | 4/11/2013 | |||||||
CACH, LLC vs ASHLEY E SMITH | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1047, 1048, 1049 ... 1078, 1079, 1080 Next |