21583 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
13CVF00342 | SHERRI RAJCHEL | 4/29/2013 | |||||||
PRIME ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION C/O RACHEL J MASON/ATTY vs SHERRI RAJCHEL | |||||||||
13CVF00344 | ANNA M PEARMAN | 4/29/2013 | |||||||
RETAIL RECOVERY SERVICE OF NJ IN vs ANNA M PEARMAN | |||||||||
13CVF00345 | KENNETH W DAVIS | 4/29/2013 | |||||||
RETAIL RECOVERY SERVICE OF NJ IN vs KENNETH W DAVIS | |||||||||
13CVG00347 | SHEENA JOHNSON | 4/29/2013 | |||||||
DOVETREE APARTMENTS vs SHEENA JOHNSON | |||||||||
13CVI00346 | OMER KODI | 4/29/2013 | |||||||
YOUSIF LAMBI vs OMER KODI | |||||||||
13CVV00072 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR | 4/29/2013 | |||||||
KEVIN E GUM vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR | |||||||||
13CVE00343 | KEVIN J WATERS | 4/29/2013 | |||||||
PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE CO. vs KEVIN J WATERS | |||||||||
13CVG00340 | DANIEL CURRENT | 4/26/2013 | |||||||
ARBORVILLE INVESTMENTS vs DANIEL CURRENT | |||||||||
13CVG00341 | JULIE PRICE | 4/26/2013 | |||||||
VITAYA NINLAWONG vs JULIE PRICE | |||||||||
13CVG00337 | GINGER STROOP | 4/25/2013 | |||||||
DOUGLAS H ENGBERSON vs GINGER STROOP | |||||||||
13CVI00338 | JAMES BARON | 4/25/2013 | |||||||
TIMOTHY PEDRO vs JAMES BARON | |||||||||
13CVF00339 | MARK DELL | 4/25/2013 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs MARK DELL | |||||||||
13CVE00335 | MICHAEL D HARRIS | 4/24/2013 | |||||||
DEBORAH WRIGHT vs MICHAEL D HARRIS | |||||||||
13CVF00334 | JOHN KEREKESH | 4/24/2013 | |||||||
CBCS vs JOHN KEREKESH | |||||||||
13CVF00336 | MARIA HOLLAND | 4/24/2013 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs MARIA HOLLAND | |||||||||
13CVG00333 | DEBRA HAWN | 4/24/2013 | |||||||
JAMES FALER vs DEBRA HAWN | |||||||||
13CVV00071 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, BMV | 4/24/2013 | |||||||
JOSHUA A ROE vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, BMV | |||||||||
13CVG00332 | ALICE BAKER | 4/23/2013 | |||||||
GREENMONT MUTUAL HOUSING CORP vs ALICE BAKER | |||||||||
13CVV00070 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR-STATE OF OHIO | 4/23/2013 | |||||||
KENDRA F NEWMAN vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR-STATE OF OHIO | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1044, 1045, 1046 ... 1078, 1079, 1080 Next |