20817 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
12CVV00192 | CAROLYN WILLIAMS ACTING REGISTRA | 11/6/2012 | |||||||
JOHN REINERT vs CAROLYN WILLIAMS ACTING REGISTRA | |||||||||
12CVV00191 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR | 11/6/2012 | |||||||
ELISABETH L CLINE vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR | |||||||||
12CVE03346 | EDWARD ECKLEBERRY | 11/5/2012 | |||||||
AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY vs EDWARD ECKLEBERRY | |||||||||
12CVF03344 | THOMAS ROHRER | 11/5/2012 | |||||||
UNIFIED CONSTRUCTION SERVICES vs THOMAS ROHRER | |||||||||
12CVF03345 | B MICHAEL BENNETT | 11/5/2012 | |||||||
MITCH RUBENSTEIN vs B MICHAEL BENNETT | |||||||||
12CVV00190 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR | 11/2/2012 | |||||||
MATTHEW T DULLI vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR | |||||||||
12CVV00189 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR | 11/2/2012 | |||||||
JOHN N SEIBERT vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR | |||||||||
12CVI03343 | BART'S CAR STORE | 11/2/2012 | |||||||
JOHN HARLEY vs BART'S CAR STORE | |||||||||
12CVI03341 | CHRYSLER JEEP OF DAYTON INC DBA WALKER CHRYSLER JE... | 11/2/2012 | |||||||
STEPHEN M WELLS vs CHRYSLER JEEP OF DAYTON INC dba WALKER CHRYSLER JE... | |||||||||
12CVG03342 | LISA M MAGERS | 11/2/2012 | |||||||
THOMAS S SORRELL. TRUSTEE vs LISA M MAGERS | |||||||||
12CVF03340 | JENNIFER DUDRICK | 11/2/2012 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN CO. OF OHIO INC vs JENNIFER DUDRICK | |||||||||
12CVF03334 | GEORGE KORENYI-BOTH | 11/1/2012 | |||||||
BUCKEYE POOLS INC vs GEORGE KORENYI-BOTH | |||||||||
12CVF03337 | WALTER HENDERSON | 11/1/2012 | |||||||
CHIMNEYS OF OAK CREEK vs WALTER HENDERSON | |||||||||
12CVF03338 | ANDRE N WILLIAMS | 11/1/2012 | |||||||
CHIMNEYS OF OAK CREEK APARTMENTS vs ANDRE N WILLIAMS | |||||||||
12CVG03335 | JOHN FIRMAN | 11/1/2012 | |||||||
MARK ELSASS vs JOHN FIRMAN | |||||||||
12CVG03336 | RICHARD DEIS | 11/1/2012 | |||||||
VIC GREEN REALTY vs RICHARD DEIS | |||||||||
12CVG03339 | BRIAN ANDERSON | 11/1/2012 | |||||||
KNOB PROPERTIES vs BRIAN ANDERSON | |||||||||
12CVF03331 | SAM ZUPPARDO | 10/31/2012 | |||||||
KETTERING MEDICAL CENTER vs SAM ZUPPARDO | |||||||||
12CVF03332 | BART A DENLINGER | 10/31/2012 | |||||||
KETTERING MEDICAL CENTER vs BART A DENLINGER | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1034, 1035, 1036 ... 1039, 1040, 1041 Next |