21583 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
13CVF00956 | KENNETH MORRIS | 12/13/2013 | |||||||
CORNERSTONE-GOVERNOURS SQ. LTD vs KENNETH MORRIS | |||||||||
13CVV00217 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | 12/13/2013 | |||||||
CHRISTOPHER L BACKUS vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
13CVV00218 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES | 12/13/2013 | |||||||
ABIDA MUKHDOMI vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES | |||||||||
13CVF00955 | KEN A PAXSON | 12/13/2013 | |||||||
FIA CARD SERVICES, N.A. vs KEN A PAXSON | |||||||||
13CVV00216 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | 12/12/2013 | |||||||
BRIDGET SUTTON vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
13CVF00952 | RONELL STEFANICS | 12/12/2013 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING D vs RONELL STEFANICS | |||||||||
13CVF00951 | CANDACE SHELLABARGER | 12/12/2013 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING D vs CANDACE SHELLABARGER | |||||||||
13CVF00950 | JASON CLARK | 12/12/2013 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING D vs JASON CLARK | |||||||||
13CVF00949 | NICHOLAS BYRD | 12/12/2013 | |||||||
BUREAUS INVESTMENT GROUP PORTFOLIO NO 7 LLC vs NICHOLAS BYRD | |||||||||
13CVE00954 | CHERYL L ROBERTS | 12/12/2013 | |||||||
ROBBIE SARLES vs CHERYL L ROBERTS | |||||||||
13CVE00953 | JACK KINDERDINE | 12/12/2013 | |||||||
LISA BRAUM vs JACK KINDERDINE | |||||||||
13CVG00947 | MELISSA ANN SCHMIDT | 12/11/2013 | |||||||
BRINKLEY PROPERTIES, LTD vs MELISSA ANN SCHMIDT | |||||||||
13CVI00948 | ANNIE SELF | 12/11/2013 | |||||||
JODY SKINNER vs ANNIE SELF | |||||||||
13CVF00945 | LISA WHITMAN | 12/10/2013 | |||||||
YANKEE DENTAL vs LISA WHITMAN | |||||||||
13CVF00946 | CHELSEA MILLARD | 12/10/2013 | |||||||
YANKEE DENTAL vs CHELSEA MILLARD | |||||||||
13CVF00944 | MICHAEL THOMAS | 12/9/2013 | |||||||
CORNERSTONE GOVERNOURS SQUARE LT DBA GOVERNOURS SQUARE vs MICHAEL THOMAS | |||||||||
13CVG00942 | YOLANDA KIRK | 12/9/2013 | |||||||
ARBORVILLE INVESTMENTS, LLC vs YOLANDA KIRK | |||||||||
13CVG00943 | CHARLES FARROW III | 12/9/2013 | |||||||
ARBORVILLE INVESTMENTS, LLC vs CHARLES FARROW III | |||||||||
13CVV00215 | MICHAEL RANKIN REGISTRAR BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES | 12/9/2013 | |||||||
LESLIE E KERN vs MICHAEL RANKIN REGISTRAR BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1002, 1003, 1004 ... 1078, 1079, 1080 Next |