21583 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
13CVF00985 | TODD ERISMAN | 12/31/2013 | |||||||
DON WRIGHT REALTY, LLC vs TODD ERISMAN | |||||||||
13CVF00986 | DANNY R SEXTON | 12/31/2013 | |||||||
STONE CREEK FINANCIAL, INC SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO OSTERMA vs DANNY R SEXTON | |||||||||
13CVG00982 | JEFFERY CLEARY | 12/31/2013 | |||||||
THIRTY 43 BY THE GREENE vs JEFFERY CLEARY | |||||||||
13CVG00984 | MELISSA TRAUFLER | 12/31/2013 | |||||||
CORNERSTONE-KETTERING PROPERTIES vs MELISSA TRAUFLER | |||||||||
13CVV00228 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | 12/31/2013 | |||||||
DARREN M BISSINGER vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
13CVF00983 | DONALD NAPIER | 12/31/2013 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs DONALD NAPIER | |||||||||
13CVF00979 | ELAINE S SMITH | 12/30/2013 | |||||||
BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE vs ELAINE S SMITH | |||||||||
13CVF00980 | ALAN REID | 12/30/2013 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs ALAN REID | |||||||||
13CVI00981 | JOSH FROWEIN | 12/30/2013 | |||||||
WANDA FABIAN vs JOSH FROWEIN | |||||||||
13CVF00978 | COURTNEY M FREDERICK | 12/24/2013 | |||||||
STERLING JEWELERS INC vs COURTNEY M FREDERICK | |||||||||
13CVF00977 | JEFFREY P. LANE | 12/23/2013 | |||||||
KETTERING ANESTHESIA ASSOC. IN vs JEFFREY P. LANE | |||||||||
13CVV00227 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | 12/23/2013 | |||||||
SHAWN T KINCAID vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
13CVV00226 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | 12/23/2013 | |||||||
JESSICA L WORLEY vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
13CVF00975 | AARON MCKILLIP | 12/20/2013 | |||||||
CORNERSTONE GOVERNOURS SQUARE LT vs AARON MCKILLIP | |||||||||
13CVG00976 | MARKO A ROY | 12/20/2013 | |||||||
CHEVY CHASE PARK APARTMENTS vs MARKO A ROY | |||||||||
13CVV00225 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, BMV | 12/20/2013 | |||||||
NICK R COOROUGH vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR, BMV | |||||||||
13CVF00971 | DARYLELLEN BLUNT | 12/19/2013 | |||||||
CBCS vs DARYLELLEN BLUNT | |||||||||
13CVF00972 | SEAN D FARR | 12/19/2013 | |||||||
CBCS vs SEAN D FARR | |||||||||
13CVF00974 | LEAH D MANOS | 12/19/2013 | |||||||
BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE vs LEAH D MANOS | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 1000, 1001, 1002 ... 1078, 1079, 1080 Next |