21583 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
14CVG02017 | JAMES SCHRIER | 1/8/2014 | |||||||
VAN LEEUWEN REAL ESTATE CO INC vs JAMES SCHRIER | |||||||||
14CVF02016 | JOANNA CRAWFORD | 1/8/2014 | |||||||
CYPRESS FINANCIAL RECOVERIES, LL vs JOANNA CRAWFORD | |||||||||
14CVF02010 | MOTION SBK | 1/7/2014 | |||||||
SPIEGLER PERFORMANCE PARTS vs MOTION SBK | |||||||||
14CVF02011 | LUKE BRYANT | 1/7/2014 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs LUKE BRYANT | |||||||||
14CVG02012 | MIKE RAWERS | 1/7/2014 | |||||||
WESTERLY RENTALS LLC vs MIKE RAWERS | |||||||||
14CVI02013 | DENVER COMBS | 1/7/2014 | |||||||
BRIAN T SHRIVER vs DENVER COMBS | |||||||||
14CVI02014 | BEVERLY KIDDWELL | 1/7/2014 | |||||||
BRIAN T SHRIVER vs BEVERLY KIDDWELL | |||||||||
14CVE02008 | DAVID L BAKER | 1/6/2014 | |||||||
STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS vs DAVID L BAKER | |||||||||
14CVF02007 | RITA R ROBILLARD | 1/6/2014 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, N.A. SUCCESSOR IN INT TO TARGET NAT'L vs RITA R ROBILLARD | |||||||||
14CVF02009 | EMILY MILLER | 1/6/2014 | |||||||
SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES OF OHIO, INC vs EMILY MILLER | |||||||||
14CVF02003 | CHRISTIANA BRANHAM | 1/3/2014 | |||||||
CAPITAL AUTO CREDIT LLC vs CHRISTIANA BRANHAM | |||||||||
14CVV00003 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR | 1/3/2014 | |||||||
COURTNEY J STEPHENS vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR | |||||||||
14CVG02002 | LACHAUNNA TOLLIVER | 1/3/2014 | |||||||
CHEVY CHASE APARTMENTS vs LACHAUNNA TOLLIVER | |||||||||
14CVG02001 | TIANA JONES | 1/3/2014 | |||||||
CHEVY CHASE APARTMENTS vs TIANA JONES | |||||||||
14CVF02006 | SHEENA JOHNSON | 1/3/2014 | |||||||
OKINUS INC vs SHEENA JOHNSON | |||||||||
14CVF02005 | KEVIN MIRANDA | 1/3/2014 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs KEVIN MIRANDA | |||||||||
14CVF02004 | CHARLIA GOODLOE | 1/3/2014 | |||||||
OKINUS INC vs CHARLIA GOODLOE | |||||||||
14CVG02000 | TIM KAUFFMAN | 1/2/2014 | |||||||
EDMUND MERSHAD vs TIM KAUFFMAN | |||||||||
14CVV00001 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | 1/2/2014 | |||||||
MICHAEL BEST vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 999, 1000, 1001 ... 1078, 1079, 1080 Next |