22900 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
15CVV00011 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | 1/20/2015 | |||||||
AMAMDA WILKINSON vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
15CVF02039 | JEFFREY M WEINGARTNER | 1/16/2015 | |||||||
CACH, LLC vs JEFFREY M WEINGARTNER | |||||||||
15CVI02037 | POSEY BUILDERS | 1/16/2015 | |||||||
THELMA REYES vs POSEY BUILDERS | |||||||||
15CVI02038 | LAWRENCE W BIGA | 1/16/2015 | |||||||
DON WRIGHT REALTY vs LAWRENCE W BIGA | |||||||||
15CVV00009 | MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES | 1/16/2015 | |||||||
HAROLD G COLLIER III vs MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES | |||||||||
15CVV00010 | MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES | 1/16/2015 | |||||||
RACHEL S THACKER vs MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES | |||||||||
15CVF02034 | YVONNE SEXTON | 1/15/2015 | |||||||
JEFFREY D SLYMAN vs YVONNE SEXTON | |||||||||
15CVF02036 | AVRAM R MEYEROWITZ | 1/15/2015 | |||||||
CITY OF KETTERING vs AVRAM R MEYEROWITZ | |||||||||
15CVI02033 | RCF PROPERTIES INC ANJANETTE FRYE | 1/15/2015 | |||||||
LAWN INNOVATIONS LLC vs RCF PROPERTIES INC ANJANETTE FRYE | |||||||||
15CVI02035 | CITY OF KETTERING | 1/15/2015 | |||||||
MARK THOMPSON vs CITY OF KETTERING | |||||||||
15CVF02031 | MELINDA GIBSON | 1/14/2015 | |||||||
KETTERING MEDICAL CENTER vs MELINDA GIBSON | |||||||||
15CVV00008 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | 1/14/2015 | |||||||
DEREK TURTON vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
15CVF02032 | REBECCA K SMITH | 1/14/2015 | |||||||
KETTERING MEDICAL CENTER vs REBECCA K SMITH | |||||||||
15CVF02026 | BETTY HERRING | 1/13/2015 | |||||||
YANKEE DENTAL vs BETTY HERRING | |||||||||
15CVF02029 | JASON SMITH | 1/13/2015 | |||||||
YANKEE DENTAL vs JASON SMITH | |||||||||
15CVF02030 | RYAN WHARTON | 1/13/2015 | |||||||
YANKEE DENTAL vs RYAN WHARTON | |||||||||
15CVI02027 | CHRISTOPHER MOBLEY | 1/13/2015 | |||||||
WILLIAM SEMMETT vs CHRISTOPHER MOBLEY | |||||||||
15CVI02028 | ERICA LYNN OVERSTREET | 1/13/2015 | |||||||
WILLIAM F SEMMETT vs ERICA LYNN OVERSTREET | |||||||||
15CVV00007 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | 1/13/2015 | |||||||
DESMOND BROWN vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 996, 997, 998 ... 1143, 1144, 1145 Next |