22900 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
15CVV00016 | DON PETIT REGISTRAR OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES | 1/29/2015 | |||||||
JONATHAN BARRY vs DON PETIT REGISTRAR OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES | |||||||||
15CVV00017 | MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES | 1/29/2015 | |||||||
ANDREW DAUGHERTY vs MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES | |||||||||
15CVF02075 | YACOUBA YEYE | 1/29/2015 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, N.A. SUCCESSOR IN INT TO TARGET NAT'L vs YACOUBA YEYE | |||||||||
15CVI02071 | DAVID SPITZER | 1/28/2015 | |||||||
DAVID CONNOLLY vs DAVID SPITZER | |||||||||
15CVI02072 | SCOTT A THOMPSON | 1/28/2015 | |||||||
ANDERSON MOORE Jr. vs SCOTT A THOMPSON | |||||||||
15CVF02069 | DEBRA CARTER | 1/27/2015 | |||||||
RAZOR CAPITAL, LLC ASSIGNEE OF CREDIT ONE BANK, N.A vs DEBRA CARTER | |||||||||
15CVI02070 | SCOTT PEACOCK | 1/27/2015 | |||||||
RICHARD STEINKE vs SCOTT PEACOCK | |||||||||
15CVF02063 | ROBERT L CABLECK | 1/26/2015 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I LLC vs ROBERT L CABLECK | |||||||||
15CVI02068 | STEPHANIE EHRING | 1/26/2015 | |||||||
KELLY DAILEY vs STEPHANIE EHRING | |||||||||
15CVI02067 | CHRISTINA HALLEG | 1/26/2015 | |||||||
KELLY DAILEY vs CHRISTINA HALLEG | |||||||||
15CVF02066 | MICHELLE KIRVECEK | 1/26/2015 | |||||||
TENDER LOVING CHIILDCARE CENTER, vs MICHELLE KIRVECEK | |||||||||
15CVF02065 | CRAIG E CLINE | 1/26/2015 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES ASSET MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LTD vs CRAIG E CLINE | |||||||||
15CVF02064 | ERIKA FESSLER | 1/26/2015 | |||||||
RAZOR CAPITAL II, LLC ASSIGNEE OF CREDIT ONE BANK, N.A vs ERIKA FESSLER | |||||||||
15CVF02062 | JAMIE WELBORN | 1/26/2015 | |||||||
SUNDANCE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT vs JAMIE WELBORN | |||||||||
15CVF02061 | ANTHONY BERRY | 1/26/2015 | |||||||
FREEDOM FIRST C U INC vs ANTHONY BERRY | |||||||||
15CVF02060 | MARCO CHAMBERS | 1/26/2015 | |||||||
TENDER LOVING CHIILDCARE CENTER, vs MARCO CHAMBERS | |||||||||
15CVF02053 | NATIONAL CENTER FOR COMPOSITES T | 1/23/2015 | |||||||
WAIBEL ENERGY SYSTEMS INC vs NATIONAL CENTER FOR COMPOSITES T | |||||||||
15CVF02057 | MICHAEL WAGNER | 1/23/2015 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs MICHAEL WAGNER | |||||||||
15CVF02058 | JANELLE RUSSO ASUNCION | 1/23/2015 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs JANELLE RUSSO ASUNCION | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 994, 995, 996 ... 1143, 1144, 1145 Next |