22942 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
15CVV00032 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | 2/18/2015 | |||||||
BORIS KOCH vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
15CVE02121 | OUTBACK STEAKHOUSE OF FLORIDA LL | 2/17/2015 | |||||||
WILLIAM C HERTEL vs OUTBACK STEAKHOUSE OF FLORIDA LL | |||||||||
15CVF02117 | ALICA IRWIN | 2/17/2015 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING D vs ALICA IRWIN | |||||||||
15CVF02118 | SUSAN M STASIK | 2/17/2015 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, N.A. SUCCESSOR IN INT TO TARGET NAT'L vs SUSAN M STASIK | |||||||||
15CVF02120 | ELIJAH DECKARD | 2/17/2015 | |||||||
DON WRIGHT REALTY, LLC vs ELIJAH DECKARD | |||||||||
15CVI02119 | MARY P BUTTS | 2/17/2015 | |||||||
R & R RECOVERY ZONE, INC vs MARY P BUTTS | |||||||||
15CVI02114 | ELIZABETH WEBB | 2/13/2015 | |||||||
RICHARD D KURUCZ vs ELIZABETH WEBB | |||||||||
15CVV00030 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | 2/13/2015 | |||||||
RODNEY O'NEAL vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
15CVV00029 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | 2/13/2015 | |||||||
JEFFREY O BAFS vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
15CVG02112 | AMANDA MCELFRESH | 2/13/2015 | |||||||
CORNERSTONE-KETTERING PROPERTIES LTD vs AMANDA MCELFRESH | |||||||||
15CVF02116 | ROGER PERRY | 2/13/2015 | |||||||
THOMAS R SCHIFF vs ROGER PERRY | |||||||||
15CVF02115 | GARY R SWEATT | 2/13/2015 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC vs GARY R SWEATT | |||||||||
15CVF02113 | KRISTIN HILTON | 2/13/2015 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC vs KRISTIN HILTON | |||||||||
15CVF02110 | DIANE CASSITY | 2/12/2015 | |||||||
BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE vs DIANE CASSITY | |||||||||
15CVG02109 | BRADLEY J RICKELS | 2/12/2015 | |||||||
TERRACE HILLS HOUSING LTD PSHIP vs BRADLEY J RICKELS | |||||||||
15CVI02111 | JENNIFER REINHOLT | 2/12/2015 | |||||||
LAKE WASHINGTON'S CONDOMINIUM OWNERS' ASSOCIATION vs JENNIFER REINHOLT | |||||||||
15CVF02105 | JAN RICE | 2/11/2015 | |||||||
RIVER VALLEY CREDIT UNION vs JAN RICE | |||||||||
15CVG02107 | MICHELLE NORRIS | 2/11/2015 | |||||||
PEAK ONE HOLDINGS, LLC vs MICHELLE NORRIS | |||||||||
15CVI02106 | WILLIAM HUDGEL JR. | 2/11/2015 | |||||||
ERIK E ULLRICH vs WILLIAM HUDGEL Jr. | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 993, 994, 995 ... 1146, 1147, 1148 Next |