22942 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
15CVF03088 | JONI KRALICH | 12/31/2015 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB vs JONI KRALICH | |||||||||
15CVI03086 | VERIZON WIRELESS | 12/31/2015 | |||||||
EZZAT ELSAYED vs VERIZON WIRELESS | |||||||||
15CVF03087 | JOSEPH TACINELLI | 12/31/2015 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK vs JOSEPH TACINELLI | |||||||||
15CVV00202 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | 12/30/2015 | |||||||
THOMAS E. CODDINGTON vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
15CVF03085 | SCOTT BARNETTE | 12/29/2015 | |||||||
CAPITAL AUTO CREDIT LLC vs SCOTT BARNETTE | |||||||||
15CVV00201 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | 12/29/2015 | |||||||
STEPHEN J RYHERD vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
15CVF03081 | TIMOTHY SYNDER | 12/28/2015 | |||||||
AMERICAN KIDNEY STONE MANAGEMENT vs TIMOTHY SYNDER | |||||||||
15CVV00200 | BMV REGISTRAR CALTRIDER, FRANKLIN | 12/28/2015 | |||||||
MEGAN R ALLEN vs BMV REGISTRAR CALTRIDER, FRANKLIN | |||||||||
15CVV00199 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | 12/28/2015 | |||||||
KRISTINA COLE-SMITH vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
15CVI03084 | WALMART SUPERSTORE # 1503 | 12/28/2015 | |||||||
SAMUEL SMITH vs WALMART SUPERSTORE # 1503 | |||||||||
15CVF03083 | ROBERT SATZGER | 12/28/2015 | |||||||
THE FRANCISCAN AT ST. LEONARD vs ROBERT SATZGER | |||||||||
15CVF03082 | CHRISTOPHER BLAKE EASTERLING | 12/28/2015 | |||||||
RELIABLE CONTRACTORES INC vs CHRISTOPHER BLAKE EASTERLING | |||||||||
15CVF03080 | CHRISTIAN CENTER | 12/28/2015 | |||||||
NATIONAL CREDIT ADJUSTERS, LLC vs CHRISTIAN CENTER | |||||||||
15CVF03079 | EMILY S LEONARD | 12/28/2015 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, N.A. SUCCESSOR IN INT TO TARGET NAT'L vs EMILY S LEONARD | |||||||||
15CVF03078 | VICKIE L BARNES | 12/28/2015 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, N.A. SUCCESSOR IN INT TO TARGET NAT'L vs VICKIE L BARNES | |||||||||
15CVF03077 | JOEL WALKER | 12/28/2015 | |||||||
CITY OF KETTERING vs JOEL WALKER | |||||||||
15CVF03074 | TERRI L HIEDEMAN | 12/22/2015 | |||||||
SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES OF OHIO, INC vs TERRI L HIEDEMAN | |||||||||
15CVF03075 | PETER TANK | 12/22/2015 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB vs PETER TANK | |||||||||
15CVF03076 | PHILP M WILDMAN | 12/22/2015 | |||||||
CITY OF KETTERING vs PHILP M WILDMAN | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 932, 933, 934 ... 1146, 1147, 1148 Next |