22900 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
16CVV00004 | REGISTRAR BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICL | 1/7/2016 | |||||||
DOUGLAS A KERNS vs REGISTRAR BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICL | |||||||||
16CVI02013 | OKSANA LUKJANENKO | 1/7/2016 | |||||||
LIAPIS LANDSCAPE & DESIGN vs OKSANA LUKJANENKO | |||||||||
16CVF02011 | ANDREA L NARTKER | 1/6/2016 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA vs ANDREA L NARTKER | |||||||||
16CVF02012 | WAEL HINDI | 1/6/2016 | |||||||
LORI IRETON vs WAEL HINDI | |||||||||
16CVV00002 | DON PETIT REGISTRAR OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES | 1/6/2016 | |||||||
THOMAS HOLTZ vs DON PETIT REGISTRAR OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES | |||||||||
16CVV00003 | DON PETIT REGISTRAR OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES | 1/6/2016 | |||||||
DAVID E HUGHES vs DON PETIT REGISTRAR OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES | |||||||||
16CVF02008 | NASER A JABER | 1/5/2016 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. SUCCESSOR TO CITIBANK (SOUTH DAK vs NASER A JABER | |||||||||
16CVF02009 | ANGIE R VANSCOY | 1/5/2016 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. vs ANGIE R VANSCOY | |||||||||
16CVG02010 | MELISSA LEYSATH | 1/5/2016 | |||||||
DOVETREE APARTMENTS vs MELISSA LEYSATH | |||||||||
16CVV00001 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | 1/5/2016 | |||||||
SURJO BANERJEE vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
16CVF02004 | DEBORAH A PHARRIS | 1/4/2016 | |||||||
ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS X, LLC vs DEBORAH A PHARRIS | |||||||||
16CVI02002 | OHIO MUTUAL INSURANCE | 1/4/2016 | |||||||
JANICE MEYER vs OHIO MUTUAL INSURANCE | |||||||||
16CVI02001 | CHRIS WALTERS | 1/4/2016 | |||||||
JERRY SNYDER vs CHRIS WALTERS | |||||||||
16CVI02000 | CHARLES E HALL | 1/4/2016 | |||||||
CHERYL SCHROYER vs CHARLES E HALL | |||||||||
16CVG02003 | BOBBIE L HIME | 1/4/2016 | |||||||
CHEVY CHASE PARK APARTMENTS vs BOBBIE L HIME | |||||||||
16CVF02007 | OLIVIA KEHL | 1/4/2016 | |||||||
SHERRETS LAW OFFICE LLC vs OLIVIA KEHL | |||||||||
16CVF02006 | LISA C MEADOWS | 1/4/2016 | |||||||
KETTERING PHYSICIAN NETWORK vs LISA C MEADOWS | |||||||||
16CVF02005 | TIMOTHY A LILE | 1/4/2016 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA vs TIMOTHY A LILE | |||||||||
15CVF03087 | JOSEPH TACINELLI | 12/31/2015 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK vs JOSEPH TACINELLI | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 929, 930, 931 ... 1143, 1144, 1145 Next |