22900 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
16CVV00011 | DON PETIT OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES | 1/13/2016 | |||||||
TYLER VICE vs DON PETIT OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES | |||||||||
16CVF02025 | JESSICA ELZA | 1/12/2016 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs JESSICA ELZA | |||||||||
16CVF02026 | JENNIFER R GRIFFITH | 1/12/2016 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC vs JENNIFER R GRIFFITH | |||||||||
16CVF02027 | ANNA MCCARTHY | 1/12/2016 | |||||||
RADIOLOGY PHYSICIANS INC C/O SLOVIN & ASSOCIATES CO. LPA vs ANNA MCCARTHY | |||||||||
16CVG02024 | RHONDA RAISON | 1/12/2016 | |||||||
ALPINE APARTMENTS vs RHONDA RAISON | |||||||||
16CVV00009 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | 1/12/2016 | |||||||
RYAN C BRAY vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
16CVG02019 | MOHAMMAD SALAM SHERIN AQA | 1/11/2016 | |||||||
THOMAS REAGAN vs MOHAMMAD SALAM SHERIN AQA | |||||||||
16CVG02023 | LOUIS A MORGAN | 1/11/2016 | |||||||
MICHAEL VELEZ vs LOUIS A MORGAN | |||||||||
16CVF02022 | LAURA V GROVES | 1/11/2016 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. vs LAURA V GROVES | |||||||||
16CVF02021 | MICHAEL C WALLACE | 1/11/2016 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. vs MICHAEL C WALLACE | |||||||||
16CVF02020 | MICHEL NELSON | 1/11/2016 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs MICHEL NELSON | |||||||||
16CVF02018 | MELISSA ABRAHAMSON | 1/11/2016 | |||||||
THE CONNER GROUP (THE VILLAGER) vs MELISSA ABRAHAMSON | |||||||||
16CVI02017 | APM | 1/8/2016 | |||||||
CAITLIN MCQUINN vs APM | |||||||||
16CVV00005 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | 1/8/2016 | |||||||
DAVID M JONES vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
16CVV00006 | DON PETIT REGISTRAR OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES | 1/8/2016 | |||||||
KEVIN M STUDEVANT vs DON PETIT REGISTRAR OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES | |||||||||
16CVV00007 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | 1/8/2016 | |||||||
JACOB MALOTT vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
16CVV00008 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | 1/8/2016 | |||||||
CLINT BACKUS vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
16CVF02014 | CHARLES W BURKS | 1/7/2016 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. SUCCESSOR TO CITIBANK (SOUTH DAK vs CHARLES W BURKS | |||||||||
16CVF02016 | SUE STOVER | 1/7/2016 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK vs SUE STOVER | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 928, 929, 930 ... 1143, 1144, 1145 Next |