20614 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
14CVV00077 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | 3/31/2014 | |||||||
RAYMOND M GILLIES vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
14CVF02255 | DONALD CHERRY | 3/28/2014 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL, INC vs DONALD CHERRY | |||||||||
14CVF02257 | KERRI ANDERSON | 3/28/2014 | |||||||
KETTERING HEALTH NETWORK CREDIT UNION vs KERRI ANDERSON | |||||||||
14CVG02254 | ROBERT CARPENTER | 3/28/2014 | |||||||
THIRTY 43 BY THE GREENE vs ROBERT CARPENTER | |||||||||
14CVG02256 | GEORGIANNA SIMPSON | 3/28/2014 | |||||||
CHEVY CHASE PARK APARTMENTS vs GEORGIANNA SIMPSON | |||||||||
14CVV00075 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | 3/28/2014 | |||||||
JAMES L MACK vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
14CVF02253 | JENNA B PUTMAN | 3/27/2014 | |||||||
SECURITY NATIONAL BANK DIVISION OF PARK NATIONAL BANK vs JENNA B PUTMAN | |||||||||
14CVG02252 | AISHA SALAHUDDIN | 3/27/2014 | |||||||
TERRACE HILL APTS INC AND vs AISHA SALAHUDDIN | |||||||||
14CVV00073 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES | 3/27/2014 | |||||||
AVERY C DONALDSON vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES | |||||||||
14CVV00074 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | 3/27/2014 | |||||||
JAMES HANLON vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
14CVI02250 | MICHAEL DUNN | 3/26/2014 | |||||||
HYDER ALJANABI vs MICHAEL DUNN | |||||||||
14CVV00072 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | 3/26/2014 | |||||||
WALTER MOORE vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
14CVI02251 | GREGORY E REED | 3/26/2014 | |||||||
KENNETH FARWELL vs GREGORY E REED | |||||||||
14CVE02245 | MARY L KEITH | 3/25/2014 | |||||||
WESTFIELD NATIONAL INS. CO SUBROGEE OF STEVE R THOMAS vs MARY L KEITH | |||||||||
14CVF02248 | BRETT WALKER | 3/25/2014 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs BRETT WALKER | |||||||||
14CVF02249 | JANEISHA FINCH | 3/25/2014 | |||||||
CACH, LLC vs JANEISHA FINCH | |||||||||
14CVG02247 | STEPHANIE MASTRI | 3/25/2014 | |||||||
CORNERSTONE-KETTERING PROPERTIES vs STEPHANIE MASTRI | |||||||||
14CVI02246 | BRIAN WEYRICH | 3/25/2014 | |||||||
MARTIN H NIZNY vs BRIAN WEYRICH | |||||||||
14CVV00070 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | 3/25/2014 | |||||||
NICOLE LUISI vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES MIKE RANKIN, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 927, 928, 929 ... 1029, 1030, 1031 Next |