22900 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
25CVG02620 | DAVID BOROUGHS | 4/4/2025 | |||||||
HMA ALLURE, LLC C/O WILLIS LAW FIRM LLC vs DAVID BOROUGHS | |||||||||
25CVF02623 | QUINTE DUKES | 4/4/2025 | |||||||
BROWNIES INDEPENDENT TRANSMISSIO vs QUINTE DUKES | |||||||||
25CVF02622 | CHIEMERIE SYLVANUS | 4/3/2025 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK vs CHIEMERIE SYLVANUS | |||||||||
25CVF02621 | CHRIS M YOUNT | 4/3/2025 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK vs CHRIS M YOUNT | |||||||||
25CVF02619 | JASMINE BANDA ZAMUDIO | 4/3/2025 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK vs JASMINE BANDA ZAMUDIO | |||||||||
25CVI02618 | SPENCER D. MIMS | 4/3/2025 | |||||||
WALTER L JACKSON Sr. vs SPENCER D. MIMS | |||||||||
25CVG02597 | JULIO ARRIAGA | 4/2/2025 | |||||||
HMA ALLURE, LLC C/O WILLIS LAW FIRM LLC vs JULIO ARRIAGA | |||||||||
25CVF02617 | DAVID C KOVER SR. | 4/2/2025 | |||||||
EAGLE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC vs DAVID C KOVER Sr. | |||||||||
25CVI02611 | JOHN WHITTMAN | 4/2/2025 | |||||||
DAVID DIXON vs JOHN WHITTMAN | |||||||||
25CVF02616 | BEVERLY SPIRES | 4/2/2025 | |||||||
BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE vs BEVERLY SPIRES | |||||||||
25CVG02596 | RONNIE LEISURE | 4/1/2025 | |||||||
JONATHAN MURRAY vs RONNIE LEISURE | |||||||||
25CVI02579 | ANTHONY TATE | 4/1/2025 | |||||||
TIA MOORE vs ANTHONY TATE | |||||||||
25CVG02595 | GABRIEL DELACRUZ | 4/1/2025 | |||||||
MONARCH INVESTMENT & MGMT GROUP, LLC AGT FOR GK OH APARTM vs GABRIEL DELACRUZ | |||||||||
25CVG02593 | PAIGE LANGFORD | 4/1/2025 | |||||||
JACOB LANGFORD vs PAIGE LANGFORD | |||||||||
25CVG02594 | STEPHEN WILDER | 4/1/2025 | |||||||
EVANIR PROPERTY MANAGEMENT FOR ENJ INVESTMENT GROUP LLC vs STEPHEN WILDER | |||||||||
25CVF02608 | LAUREN SHEALY | 3/31/2025 | |||||||
JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS, P vs LAUREN SHEALY | |||||||||
25CVF02610 | DORIS FISHER | 3/31/2025 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs DORIS FISHER | |||||||||
25CVF02605 | VICTORIA M CARTER | 3/31/2025 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs VICTORIA M CARTER | |||||||||
25CVF02614 | MYLYNDA GUTHRIE | 3/31/2025 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. vs MYLYNDA GUTHRIE | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 9, 10, 11 ... 1143, 1144, 1145 Next |