22900 Cases | Kettering Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
25CVF02729 | MONEER H WAHDAN | 4/14/2025 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT vs MONEER H WAHDAN | |||||||||
25CVF02726 | CYNTHIA KING | 4/14/2025 | |||||||
CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC vs CYNTHIA KING | |||||||||
25CVF02727 | EMILY GADDIS | 4/14/2025 | |||||||
CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC vs EMILY GADDIS | |||||||||
25CVF02730 | DUSTIN BARNHEISER | 4/14/2025 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT vs DUSTIN BARNHEISER | |||||||||
25CVF02746 | QUENTIN MCKINNON | 4/14/2025 | |||||||
VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC vs QUENTIN MCKINNON | |||||||||
25CVF02741 | JOSEPH DRAKE | 4/14/2025 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC vs JOSEPH DRAKE | |||||||||
25CVF02732 | MIKE MILLER | 4/14/2025 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA vs MIKE MILLER | |||||||||
25CVF02723 | ROBERT PROFITT | 4/14/2025 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs ROBERT PROFITT | |||||||||
25CVF02731 | MICHAEL NOBLE | 4/14/2025 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs MICHAEL NOBLE | |||||||||
25CVF02719 | SANTIAGO TORRES | 4/14/2025 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs SANTIAGO TORRES | |||||||||
25CVE02664 | CHRISTIAN KLAWON | 4/14/2025 | |||||||
CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY vs CHRISTIAN KLAWON | |||||||||
25CVV00014 | BMV | 4/11/2025 | |||||||
RYAN PARKER vs BMV | |||||||||
25CVG02652 | SUZY PARKER | 4/10/2025 | |||||||
THE CONNOR GROUP FOR DOVETREE TIC 1 LLC, ET AL 6 vs SUZY PARKER | |||||||||
25CVG02641 | CORINITHIAN WARD | 4/9/2025 | |||||||
GREATER DAYTON PREMIER MANAGEMEN vs CORINITHIAN WARD | |||||||||
25CVG02642 | MICHAEL WILSON | 4/9/2025 | |||||||
GREATER DAYTON PREMIER MANAGEMEN vs MICHAEL WILSON | |||||||||
25CVG02640 | RAYMOND TYNER SR. | 4/8/2025 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES, INC. FOR NEW HUNTLEY RIDGE, LLC vs RAYMOND TYNER Sr. | |||||||||
25CVI02627 | STACEY R SMITH | 4/8/2025 | |||||||
MIAMI VALLEY COLON AND RECTAL SURGEONS vs STACEY R SMITH | |||||||||
25CVI02639 | SODEL TOWNE PROPERTIES | 4/8/2025 | |||||||
S. BRIAN MCBRYDE vs SODEL TOWNE PROPERTIES | |||||||||
25CVF02638 | NATAKA LOWERY | 4/8/2025 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO vs NATAKA LOWERY | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 7, 8, 9 ... 1143, 1144, 1145 Next |