11298 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
16CVF03180 | DONALD C WHITE | 2/15/2017 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs DONALD C WHITE | |||||||||
17CVF02026 | PAUL O POPP | 2/14/2017 | |||||||
BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE vs PAUL O POPP | |||||||||
16CVF02304 | CHRIS STEPHENS | 2/13/2017 | |||||||
CINCINNATI INSURANCE CO. vs CHRIS STEPHENS | |||||||||
16CVF02895 | GLEN COMBS JR. | 2/10/2017 | |||||||
DON WRIGHT REALTY vs GLEN COMBS Jr. | |||||||||
16CVF03121 | SAMUEL DRISKELL | 2/10/2017 | |||||||
UNIVERSITY OF CINCINNATI MEDICAL vs SAMUEL DRISKELL | |||||||||
16CVF03203 | EVAN B WILLIAMS | 2/10/2017 | |||||||
FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, LLC vs EVAN B WILLIAMS | |||||||||
16CVE02397 | ROBERT GARNER | 2/9/2017 | |||||||
CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY vs ROBERT GARNER | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 480, 481, 482 ... 563, 564, 565 Next |