10485 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
18CVF02784 | SPENCER E DUGAN | 7/18/2018 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. vs SPENCER E DUGAN | |||||||||
18CVE02223 | LINDA PEGRAM | 7/17/2018 | |||||||
CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY vs LINDA PEGRAM | |||||||||
18CVI02864 | TODD A KRISTOFF | 7/17/2018 | |||||||
ERIC WILLIAMS vs TODD A KRISTOFF | |||||||||
18CVF02181 | CARLA ABERNATHY | 7/16/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs CARLA ABERNATHY | |||||||||
18CVF02503 | JOSHUA BENFIELD | 7/16/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs JOSHUA BENFIELD | |||||||||
18CVF02647 | DEBORAH KRUG | 7/16/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs DEBORAH KRUG | |||||||||
18CVF03137 | DONNA LEFELD | 7/16/2018 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORP vs DONNA LEFELD | |||||||||
18CVF02650 | MATTHEW MAWBY | 7/13/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs MATTHEW MAWBY | |||||||||
18CVF02165 | STEPHEN E HARNESS | 7/13/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs STEPHEN E HARNESS | |||||||||
18CVE03011 | KYLE GROOMS | 7/13/2018 | |||||||
PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO. vs KYLE GROOMS | |||||||||
18CVI02794 | DAN REO | 7/11/2018 | |||||||
LINDA MCKELVEY vs DAN REO | |||||||||
17CVF03719 | DAVID ROHRBACK | 7/10/2018 | |||||||
MERRICK BANK CORPORATION vs DAVID ROHRBACK | |||||||||
18CVF02025 | SHARON TAYLOR | 7/10/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs SHARON TAYLOR | |||||||||
18CVF02118 | PAUL BEHNKE | 7/10/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs PAUL BEHNKE | |||||||||
18CVF02357 | DENISE E KIRKLAND | 7/10/2018 | |||||||
DAY AIR CREDIT UNION, INC vs DENISE E KIRKLAND | |||||||||
18CVF02497 | JANET L COLLINS | 7/10/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs JANET L COLLINS | |||||||||
18CVF02539 | ASHLEY N BEREDA | 7/10/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs ASHLEY N BEREDA | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 328, 329, 330 ... 523, 524, 525 Next |